EP1588115 - HEAT EXCHANGER, ESPECIALLY GAS COOLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/03] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FÖRSTER, Uwe Altgorbitzer Ring 50 01169 Dresden / DE | 02 /
MOLT, Kurt Ruländerweg 23 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Grauel, Andreas BEHR GmbH & Co., Intellectual Property Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | Grauel, Andreas BEHR GmbH & Co. KG, Intellectual Property, G-IP, Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03815365.6 | 07.11.2003 | [2005/43] | WO2003EP12467 | Priority number, date | DE2003102412 | 21.01.2003 Original published format: DE 10302412 | [2005/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004065882 | Date: | 05.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1588115 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1588115 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/02, F28F9/04 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
F28F9/0214 (EP,US);
F28D1/0535 (EP,US);
F28D2021/0073 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEÜBERTRAGER, INSBESONDERE GASKÜHLER | [2005/43] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER, ESPECIALLY GAS COOLER | [2005/43] | French: | ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE, NOTAMMENT REFROIDISSEUR DE GAZ | [2005/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 20.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.09.2009 | CZ | 09.09.2009 | DK | 09.09.2009 | EE | 09.09.2009 | FI | 09.09.2009 | IE | 09.09.2009 | IT | 09.09.2009 | NL | 09.09.2009 | RO | 09.09.2009 | SE | 09.09.2009 | SI | 09.09.2009 | SK | 09.09.2009 | TR | 09.09.2009 | AT | 07.11.2009 | LU | 07.11.2009 | BE | 30.11.2009 | BG | 30.11.2009 | CH | 30.11.2009 | LI | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | GR | 10.12.2009 | ES | 20.12.2009 | PT | 11.01.2010 | HU | 10.03.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
IT | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
AT | 07.11.2009 | ||
LU | 07.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
HU | 10.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
IT | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
AT | 07.11.2009 | ||
LU | 07.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
IT | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
AT | 07.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
AT | 07.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 09.09.2009 | |
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | FI | 09.09.2009 | |
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 09.09.2009 | |
SE | 09.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4770240 (DAWSON RICHARD T [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 9,17 *; | [A]US5172761 (LYON PETER A [US]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]US5174373 (SHINMURA TOSHIHARU [JP]) [A] 1-14 * figures 6A-6G *; | [DA]US6155340 (FOLKEDAL LEIF [NO], et al) [DA] 1-14 * the whole document * |