EP1592965 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ELECTROCHEMICAL SENSOR AND STRUCTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huang, Chun-Mu 6Fl., No. 60-5, Jengyi S.Rd. Sanchung City Taipei 241 / TW | [2005/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Chun-Mu 6Fl., No. 60-5, Jengyi S. Rd. Sanchung City, Taipei 241 / TW | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 03815763.2 | 31.01.2003 | [2005/45] | WO2003US03084 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004070373 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1592965 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.08.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/30, G01N27/403 | [2010/28] | CPC: |
G01N27/3272 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/45] | G01N27/327 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ELEKTROCHEMISCHEN SENSORS UND DESSEN STRUKTUR | [2005/45] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ELECTROCHEMICAL SENSOR AND STRUCTURE THEREOF | [2005/45] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CAPTEUR ELECTROCHIMIQUE ET STRUCTURE ASSOCIEE | [2005/45] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 14.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/11] | 19.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US6212416 (WARD W KENNETH [US], et al) [I] 10-44 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 8; figures 1,2 * * column 12, lines 49-61 * * column 13, lines 22-29 * [Y] 1-9; | [A]EP1098000 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS CORP [US]) [A] 1-44 * figure 13 ** paragraphs [0027] , [0035] , [0036] *; | [YA]US2002005352 (OFFENBACHER HELMUT [AT]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0080]; claims 1,6 * [A] 10-44 | International search | [X]US6212416 (WARD W KENNETH [US], et al); | [X]US6134461 (SAY JAMES [US], et al); | [A]US2002005352 (OFFENBACHER HELMUT [AT]) |