EP1594649 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR JOINING PIPE ENDS TOGETHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heerema Marine Contractors Nederland SE 55, Vondellaan 2332 AA Leiden / NL | [2013/36] |
Former [2013/27] | For all designated states Heerema Marine Contractors Nederland B.V. 55, Vondellaan 2332 AA Leiden / NL | ||
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states Heerema Marine Contractors Nederland B.V. Vondellaan 47 2332 AA Leiden / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOPPERT, Frits-Jan Moldau 13 NL-2911 HE Nieuwerkerk Aan den Ijssel / NL | 02 /
VAN ZANDWIJK, Cornelis Herbarenerf 13 NL-2743 HA Waddinxveen / NL | [2005/46] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2014/44] |
Former [2013/38] | Mertens, Hans Victor Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) J.J. Viottastraat 31 1071 JP Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2005/46] | Mertens, Hans Victor van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 03815870.5 | 28.03.2003 | [2005/46] | WO2003NL00240 | Priority number, date | WO2003NL00114 | 14.02.2003 Original published format: PCT/NL0300/114 | [2005/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004071702 | Date: | 26.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1594649 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1594649 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1594649 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/028 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
B23K9/0286 (EP,US);
B23K26/282 (EP,US);
B23K37/0211 (EP,US);
B23K37/0276 (EP,US);
B23K2101/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/48] |
Former [2005/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERBINDEN VON ROHRENDEN | [2013/06] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR JOINING PIPE ENDS TOGETHER | [2005/46] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR L'ASSEMBLAGE D'EXTREMITES DE CONDUITES | [2005/46] |
Former [2005/46] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBINDUNG VON ROHRENDEN | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 21.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.06.2014
02.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Saipem S.p.A. Via Martiri di Cefalonia, 67 20097 San Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT Opponent's representative Abel & Imray LLP, et al, et al Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.06.2014
02.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Saipem S.p.A. Via Martiri di Cefalonia, 67 20097 San Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT Opponent's representative Abel & Imray, et al, et al Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | ||
Former [2014/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.06.2014
Saipem S.p.A. Via Martiri di Cefalonia, 67 20097 San Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT Opponent's representative Pearson, James Ginn, et al, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | 23.07.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.11.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.06.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.06.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.05.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 11.10.2019 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 08.09.2016 | Appeal received No. T2083/16 | 08.11.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 31.05.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2003 | AT | 18.09.2013 | BE | 18.09.2013 | BG | 18.09.2013 | CY | 18.09.2013 | CZ | 18.09.2013 | DK | 18.09.2013 | EE | 18.09.2013 | ES | 18.09.2013 | FI | 18.09.2013 | IT | 18.09.2013 | MC | 18.09.2013 | NL | 18.09.2013 | RO | 18.09.2013 | SE | 18.09.2013 | SI | 18.09.2013 | SK | 18.09.2013 | TR | 18.09.2013 | GR | 19.12.2013 | PT | 20.01.2014 | IE | 28.03.2014 | LU | 28.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | FR | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | DE | 01.10.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.03.2003 | |
AT | 18.09.2013 | ||
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
BG | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.03.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
DE | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
BG | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.03.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
DE | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
BG | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.03.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
DE | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.03.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
DE | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.03.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | BE | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | SE | 18.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR2223127 (GURTLER HEBERT & CO INC [US]) [X] 21-23,55-57 * page 10, paragraph L * * figure 6; claims 1,2,6 * [Y] 58; | [AD]US6313426 (BELLONI ANTONIO [IT], et al) [AD] 1-67* column W *; | [AYX]EP1249295 (SAIPEM SPA [IT]) [A] 1-6,12,14,17,18,20,28,42-48,54 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0034]; figures 3-7 * [Y] 58 [X] 25-27 | Opposition | WO2004052580 | GB1450470 | US2001017292 | US3681560 | US2795689 | GB1113412 |