EP1605843 - CUTTING AND FORMING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthes GmbH Eimattstrasse 3 4436 Oberdorf / CH | [2006/43] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states Synthes AG Chur Grabenstrasse 15 7002 Chur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTHYS-MARK, Romano Haus Guardaval CH-7272 Davos Clavadel / CH | 02 /
GELPKE, Hans Neinernstrasse 17 CH-8542 Wiesendangen / CH | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Lusuardi, Werther Dr. Lusuardi AG Kreuzbühlstrasse 8 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | Lusuardi, Werther Giovanni Dr. Lusuardi AG, Kreuzbühlstrasse 8 8008 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 03816328.3 | 21.03.2003 | [2005/51] | WO2003CH00183 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004082492 | Date: | 30.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1605843 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1605843 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/58, B23D29/02 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
A61B17/685 (EP,US);
A61B17/60 (KR);
A61B17/56 (KR);
A61B17/8863 (EP,US);
A61F5/00 (KR);
B21F11/00 (EP,US);
B21F15/00 (EP,US);
B21F15/06 (EP,US);
B23D29/023 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEIDE- UND UMFORMVORRICHTUNG | [2005/51] | English: | CUTTING AND FORMING DEVICE | [2005/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COUPE ET DE FORMAGE | [2005/51] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 28.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.05.2007 | CZ | 09.05.2007 | DK | 09.05.2007 | EE | 09.05.2007 | FI | 09.05.2007 | IE | 09.05.2007 | NL | 09.05.2007 | RO | 09.05.2007 | SI | 09.05.2007 | SK | 09.05.2007 | TR | 09.05.2007 | BG | 09.08.2007 | GR | 10.08.2007 | PT | 09.10.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/35] | CY | 09.05.2007 | |
CZ | 09.05.2007 | ||
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
EE | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
RO | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 09.05.2007 | |
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
EE | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
RO | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 09.05.2007 | |
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
RO | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 09.05.2007 | |
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | CZ | 09.05.2007 | |
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | CZ | 09.05.2007 | |
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | DK | 09.05.2007 | |
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | DK | 09.05.2007 | |
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | FI | 09.05.2007 | |
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 09.05.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3315669 (RHODES WILLIAM A) [X] 1-9,12-19 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1277515 (FEINMECHANIK AG VORMALS JETTER & SCHEERER); | [A]DE8708571U (MÜLLER) [A] 5,7,8 * page 4, line 7 - line 8; figure - *; | [A]EP0928602 (HERMANN WERNER [CH]) [A] 13 * the whole document *; | [A]US5980547 (RINNER JAMES A [US]) [A] 9 * column 2, line 35 - line 55; figure - * |