EP1651981 - DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING AN OPTICAL MIRROR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STIERLE, Joerg Beethovenstrasse 36 71111 Waldenbuch / DE | 02 /
WOLF, Peter Sandweg 23 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 03 /
RENZ, Kai Keltenstr. 6 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 04 /
SCHULTE, Clemens Reinsburgstrasse 96 70197 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/18] | Application number, filing date | 03816498.4 | 10.12.2003 | [2006/18] | WO2003DE04069 | Priority number, date | DE2003114772 | 31.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10314772 | [2006/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004088356 | Date: | 14.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1651981 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1651981 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/08, G01S7/481, G01S7/497, G02B7/182 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
G01S7/4813 (EP,US);
G01S17/08 (EP,US);
G01S7/4972 (EP,US);
G02B7/1825 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2006/27] |
Former [2006/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM JUSTIEREN EINES OPTISCHEN SPIEGELS | [2006/18] | English: | DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING AN OPTICAL MIRROR | [2006/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR REGLER UN MIROIR OPTIQUE | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 24.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 28.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.04.2008 | 17.03.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.02.2006 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.2006 | 24.02.2006 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   24.02.2006 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.02.2006 | M01   Fee paid on   24.02.2006 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.02.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE2714494 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-7 * page 5 - page 6 * [Y] 8,9,15,16; | [XY]JP2002244018 ; | [X]US4648692 (KINOSHITA TSUYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]JPH06250073 ; | [Y]DE4221079 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 8 * column 1, line 49 - line 56 *; | [Y]WO0036311 (HOLSCHER WINFRIED K W [DE]) [Y] 9 * page 3, line 30 - line 35 * * page 12, lines 3-6 *; | [Y]JPH0735856 ; | [Y]WO0208692 (LEICA GEOSYSTEMS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 15,16 * figure 1 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021212), vol. 2002, no. 12, & JP2002244018 A 20020828 (HITACHI ELECTRONICS ENG CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * [Y] 8,9,15,16 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941206), vol. 018, no. 642, Database accession no. (P - 1838), & JP06250073 A 19940909 (OPT MIHARA:KK) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950630), vol. 1995, no. 05, & JP7035856 A 19950207 (OPT:KK) [Y] 15,16 * abstract * |