EP1618224 - USE OF THERMAL SPRAYING WITH NIOBIUM OXIDES DURING THE PRODUCTION PROCESS OF ROLLED STEEL PLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/04] | USE OF THERMAL SPRAYING WITH NIOBIUM OXIDES AND NIOBIUM ALLOYS DURING THE PRODUCTION PROCESS OF ROLLED STEEL PLATES | ||
[2017/35] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Instituto Alberto Luiz Coimbra de Pós Graduação e Pesquisa de Engenharia - COPPE/UFRJ Avenida Horacio Macedo No. 2030 Predio do Centro de Tecnologia Bl. G. Sala 101 Cidade Universitária, Ilha do Fundão 21941-596 Rio de Janeiro - RJ / BR | [2017/28] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states COPPE/UFRJ - COORDENACAO DOS PROGRAMAS DE POS GRADUACAO DE ENGENHARIA DA UNIVERSIDADE FEDERAL DO RIO DE JANEIRO Centro de Tecnologia, S/N, Bloco G CEP-21945-970 Ilha do Fund o, RJ / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIRANDA, Luiz Roberto Martins Av. Ypiranga 954 Centro CEP 25610-150 Petrópolis - RJ / BR | 02 /
CARVALHO, Ladimir José Rua Firmina Araújo, 195 sb Campo Grande CEP-23071-090 Rio de Janeiro, RJ / BR | 03 /
PEREIRA, Antônio Carlos Gonçalves rua Bingen, 333 Centro CEP-25660-000 Petrópolis, RJ / BR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | 01 /
MIRANDA, Luiz, Roberto, Martins Av. Ypiranga 954, Centro CEP 25610-150 Petrópolis - RJ / BR | ||
02 /
CARVALHO, Ladimir, José Rua Firmina Araújo, 195 sb, Campo Grande CEP-23071-090 Rio de Janeiro, RJ / BR | |||
03 /
PEREIRA, Antônio, Carlos, Gonçalves rua Bingen, 333 Centro CEP-25660-000 Petrúpolis, RJ / BR | Representative(s) | Brown, Alexander Edward Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | Johansson, Lars-Erik Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors / Uddeholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 03816764.9 | 18.08.2003 | [2006/04] | WO2003BR00117 | Priority number, date | BR20030301126 | 28.04.2003 Original published format: BR 0301126 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004097061 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1618224 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 11.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/06, C23C16/40, C23C4/06, C23C4/11 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
C23C4/06 (EP,US);
C23C4/11 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/04] | C23C14/06, C23C16/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON THERMISCHEM SPRITZEN MIT NIOBOXIDEN WÄHREND DER HERSTELLUNG VON GEWALZTEN STAHLBLECHEN | [2017/35] | English: | USE OF THERMAL SPRAYING WITH NIOBIUM OXIDES DURING THE PRODUCTION PROCESS OF ROLLED STEEL PLATES | [2017/35] | French: | UTILISATION DE PULVÉRISATION THERMIQUE AVEC DES OXYDES DE NIOBIUM DURANT LE PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PLAQUES D'ACIER LAMINÉES | [2017/36] |
Former [2006/04] | VERWENDUNG VON THERMISCHEM SPRITZEN MIT NIOBOXIDEN UND NIOBLEGIERUNGEN WÄHREND DER HERSTELLUNG VON GEWALZTEN STAHLBLECHEN | ||
Former [2006/04] | USE OF THERMAL SPRAYING WITH NIOBIUM OXIDES AND NIOBIUM ALLOYS DURING THE PRODUCTION PROCESS OF ROLLED STEEL PLATES | ||
Former [2006/04] | PULVERISATION THERMIQUE AVEC DES OXYDES DE NIOBIUM | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 10.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 22.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/28] | 08.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 06.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 14   M06   Fee paid on   06.09.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1054075 (RENAULT [FR]); | [A]US5111567 (LEINO JORMA [FI], et al); | [A]US6238807 (YASUDA TSUJIHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]US4609401 (SIMM WOLFGANG [CH], et al) | Examination | US3313633 | US3864093 | US5330850 | EP1546424 | by applicant | US3313633 | BR0203534 |