EP1638755 - IMPROVED MIXER FOR A PLASTICIZING SCREW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Husky Injection Molding Systems Ltd. 500 Queen Street South Bolton, ON L7E 5S5 / CA | [2013/36] |
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states Husky Injection Molding Systems S.A. Technical Center Zone Industrielle Riedgen B.P. 93 3401 Dudelange / LU | ||
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states HUSKY INJECTION MOLDING SYSTEMS LTD. 500 Queen Street South Bolton Ontario L7E 5S5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Raymond, W. 7 Bunchgrass Place Brampton, Ontario L6R 2J9 / CA | 02 /
CRAIG, Denise, D. 137 Lake Promenade Toronto, Ontario M8W 1A6 / CA | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Vossius, Corinna, et al Corinna Vossius IP Group Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Buchenstrasse 17 82064 Straßlach-Dingharting / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | Vossius, Corinna, et al Corinna Vossius IP Group Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Widenmayerstrasse 43 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/35] | Vossius, Corinna, et al Corinna Vossius IP Group Intellectual Property Law Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Widenmayerstrasse 43 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/16] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2008/14] | Dearling, Bruce Clive, et al Husky Injection Molding Systems SA Technical Center Zone Industrielle Riedgen B.P. 93 3401 Dudelange / LU | ||
Former [2007/02] | Vossius, Corinna, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/13] | Dearling, Bruce Clive Husky Injection Molding Systems SA Technical Center Zone Industrielle Riedgen B.P. 93 3401 Dudelange / LU | Application number, filing date | 03817230.0 | 19.06.2003 | [2006/13] | WO2003CA00918 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004110725 | Date: | 23.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1638755 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1638755 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/60, B29C47/62, B29C47/64, B29C45/54, B29C45/60 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
B29C45/47 (EP,US);
B29C48/53 (EP,US);
B29C48/65 (EP,US);
B29C48/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Extension states | AL | 19.01.2006 | LT | 19.01.2006 | LV | 19.01.2006 | MK | 19.01.2006 | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE MISCHVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE PLASTIFIZIERSCHNECKE | [2006/13] | English: | IMPROVED MIXER FOR A PLASTICIZING SCREW | [2006/13] | French: | PARTIE DE MELANGE AMELIOREE POUR VIS DE PLASTIFICATION | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 11.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.06.2003 | AT | 30.10.2013 | BE | 30.10.2013 | BG | 30.10.2013 | CY | 30.10.2013 | CZ | 30.10.2013 | DK | 30.10.2013 | EE | 30.10.2013 | ES | 30.10.2013 | FI | 30.10.2013 | IT | 30.10.2013 | MC | 30.10.2013 | NL | 30.10.2013 | RO | 30.10.2013 | SE | 30.10.2013 | SI | 30.10.2013 | SK | 30.10.2013 | TR | 30.10.2013 | GR | 31.01.2014 | PT | 28.02.2014 | GB | 19.06.2014 | IE | 19.06.2014 | LU | 19.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | FR | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 19.06.2003 | |
AT | 30.10.2013 | ||
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 19.06.2014 | ||
IE | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 19.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 19.06.2014 | ||
IE | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 19.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 19.06.2014 | ||
IE | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 19.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 19.06.2014 | ||
IE | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 19.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 19.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 30.10.2013 | |
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 30.10.2013 | |
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH115215 ; | [A]JP2001062897 ; | [DXA]US3687423 (KOCH HEINZ, et al) [DX] 1-3,15,16,23-25,32-34 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 6 * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 5 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 4-14,17-22,26-31,35-40; | [DX]US4107788 (ANDERS DIETMAR) [DX] 1-3,15,16,23,32 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 12 * * figure - *; | [X]EP0839631 (SPIREX CORP [US]) [X] 1,4,7-15 * column 2, line 34 - line 54 * * column 4, line 35 - column 5, line 13 * * figures 1,2; claim - *; | [XA]US6017145 (JENKINS STEVEN R [US], et al) [X] 1,4,15 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 12 * * column 5, line 23 - line 65; figure - * [A] 2,3,5-14,16-40; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 04, & JP11005215 A 19990112 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD) [X] 1-40 * abstract * | [XA] - "DER EXTRUDER - GRUNDLAGE FUR QUALITAT UND WIRTSCHAFTLICHKEIT", PLASTVERARBEITER, ZECHNER UND HUETHIG VERLAG GMBH. SPEYER/RHEIN, DE, (19890701), vol. 40, no. 7, ISSN 0032-1338, page 116,118,120,12, XP000104045 [X] 1,4,15 * figures 7,8 * [A] 2,3,5-14,16-40 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010710), vol. 2000, no. 20, & JP2001062897 A 20010313 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1-40 * abstract * | Examination | DE10130759 |