EP1671663 - INTERMITTENT URETHRA SELF-RETAINING CATHETER SET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TSUKADA MEDICAL RESEARCH CO., LTD. 8-12-501, Kitashinjuku 4-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 169-0074 / JP | [2006/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUKADA, Osamu 318-1, Ohaza Sumiyoshi Ueda-shi, Nagano 386-0002 / JP | 02 /
NAKAJIMA, Yasuhiko 5854-4, Tamura Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-0013 / JP | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | Makovski, Priscilla Mary Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | Makovski, Priscilla Mary BARKER BRETTELL 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03818285.3 | 21.08.2003 | [2006/25] | WO2003JP10563 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005018714 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1671663 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1671663 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61M1/00, A61M25/10 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
A61M25/0017 (EP,US);
A61M25/002 (EP,US);
A61M25/0111 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0018 (EP,US);
A61M25/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/25] | A61M1/00, A61M25/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2006/48] |
Former [2006/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | INTERMITTIERENDES SELBSTHALTENDES HARNRÖHREN-KATHETERSET | [2006/25] | English: | INTERMITTENT URETHRA SELF-RETAINING CATHETER SET | [2006/25] | French: | ENSEMBLE CATHETER A FONCTIONNEMENT INTERMTTENT DEMEURANT DANS L'UTHERE | [2006/25] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2006 | Translation filed | 09.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 31.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2011/32] |
Former [2011/14] | IT | 21.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0371497 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [DY]JP2587642Y (TSUKADA, OSAMU) [DY] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5916195 (ESHEL UZI [IL], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1090656 (TSUKADA MEDICAL RES CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]US2003153899 (ESHEL UZI [IL], et al) [A] 1-7* abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH0135234B ; | [Y]JPH09206370 (TSUKADA MEDICAL RES KK); | [Y]JP2587642Y ; | [Y]JP2001500023 ; | [Y]JP2001104472 (TSUKADA MEDICAL RES KK); | [Y]JP2001309973 (JMS CO LTD) |