EP1660288 - MIXING DRUM DRIVE RING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mc Neilus Truck and Manufacturing, Inc. P.O. Box 70, Highway 14 East Dodge Center, MN 55927 / US | For all designated states Favco Composite Technology (US), Inc. 39 Shoalhaven Road Sylvania Waters Sydney, NSW 2224 / AU | For all designated states Favco Truck Mixers International Pty Limited 39 Shoalhaven Road Sylvania Waters Sydney, NSW 2224 / AU | For all designated states Composite Technology R&D Pty Limited 39 Shoalhaven Road Sylvania Waters Sydney, NSW 2224 / AU | For all designated states Khouri, Anthony James 39 Shoalhaven Road, Sylvania Waters Sydney New South Wales 2224 / AU | For all designated states RODGERS, William 10-12 Childs Road, Chipping Norton Sydney, NSW 2224 / AU | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALY, Ted 710 20th Street, NE Kasson, MN 55944 / US | 02 /
CHRISTENSON, Ronald, E. 720 Boss Reeves Road Parsons, TN 30363 / US | 03 /
PIHKOVICH, Vadim / US | [2006/25] |
Former [2006/22] | 01 /
DALY, Ted 809 4th Street, NE Kasson, MN 55944 / US | ||
02 /
CHRISTENSON, Ronald, E. 720 Boss Reeves Road Parsons, TN 30363 / US | |||
03 /
PIHKOVICH, Vadim / US | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 03818335.6 | 15.08.2003 | [2006/22] | WO2003US25438 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005018895 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1660288 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B28C5/38 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
B28C5/0831 (EP,US);
B28C5/2054 (EP,US);
B28C5/421 (EP,US);
B28C5/4268 (EP,US);
B29C45/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MISCHTROMMELTREIBRING | [2006/22] | English: | MIXING DRUM DRIVE RING | [2006/22] | French: | ANNEAU DE COMMANDE D'UN TAMBOUR MALAXEUR | [2006/22] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 24.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/17] | 10.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   12.11.2009 | 31.08.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3664161 (CRESSMAN FRED D) [A] 1,16,30,44,57,63,64 * column 1, line 1 - column 1, line 6 * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 3 * * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 42 ** figures 1,5 *; | [E]WO2005018897 (MC NEILUS TRUCK & MFG INC [US], et al) [E] 1-64 * the whole document * * in particular * * page 24, line 9 - page 27, line 14 * * figures 1-3,12-15 *; | [E]WO2005018894 (MC NEILUS TRUCK & MFG INC [US], et al) [E] 1-64 * the whole document * * in particular * * page 16, line 6 - page 27, line 7 * * figures 1-3,12-15 * | International search | [A]US2511240 (BOHMER CLARENCE I, et al); | [A]JPS5388261 (SHIN MEIWA IND CO LTD); | [A]US4435082 (BISHOP ROBERT J [US]) | Examination | US5441341 | WO0126871 | by applicant | US3664161 | JPS5388261 | WO0126871 | WO03101694 | WO2003AU01226 |