EP1660289 - Concrete mixing drum and concrete mixing truck [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/22] | MIXING DRUM BLADE | ||
[2010/27] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mc Neilus Truck and Manufacturing, Inc. P.O. Box 70, Highway 14 East Dodge Center, MN 55927 / US | For all designated states Favco Composite Technology (US), Inc. 39 Shoalhaven Road Sylvania Waters Sydney, NSW 2224 / AU | For all designated states Favco Truck Mixers International Pty Limited 39 Shoalhaven Road Sylvania Waters Sydney, NSW 2224 / AU | For all designated states Composite Technology R&D Pty Limited 39 Shoalhaven Road Sylvania Waters Sydney, NSW 2224 / AU | For all designated states Khouri, Anthony James 39 Shoalhaven Road, Sylvania Waters Sydney New South Wales 2224 / AU | For all designated states RODGERS, William 10-12 Childs Road, Chipping Norton Sydney, NSW 2224 / AU | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHOURI, Anthony James 39 Shoalhaven Road, Sylvania Waters Sydney, New South Wales 2224 / AU | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 03818344.8 | 15.08.2003 | [2006/22] | WO2003US25655 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005018898 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1660289 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B28C5/42 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
B28C5/0831 (EP,US);
B28C5/2054 (EP,US);
B28C5/421 (EP,US);
B28C5/4268 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Betonmischertrommel und Betonmischwagen | [2010/27] | English: | Concrete mixing drum and concrete mixing truck | [2010/27] | French: | Tambour-malaxeur à béton et camion bétonnière | [2010/27] |
Former [2006/22] | MISCHTROMMELSCHAUFEL | ||
Former [2006/22] | MIXING DRUM BLADE | ||
Former [2006/22] | AUBE DE TAMBOUR MELANGEUR | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 13.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/24] | 26.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   12.11.2009 | 31.08.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO03101694 (KHOURI ANTHONY [AU]) [E] 1,3,6,7,9,10,13,15,16,20-22,25,26,28-30,34-39,43,45-51,54-56,59-64,67 * the whole document * * in particular * * page 13, line 25 - page 17, line 16 ** figures 3a,3b,4 *; | [E]WO2005018894 (MC NEILUS TRUCK & MFG INC [US], et al) [E] 1-67 * the whole document * * in particular * * page 6, line 25 - page 14, line 13 * * claims 1-81 * * figures 3-6 *; | [E]WO2005018897 (MC NEILUS TRUCK & MFG INC [US], et al) [E] 1-67 * the whole document * * in particular * * page 7, line 1 - page 14, line 17 * * figures 3-6 * | International search | [X]WO0126871 (KHOURI ANTHONY [AU], et al); | [A]US3795121 (CRESSMAN F); | [A]US5178457 (HELMY NASHAT N [US]) |