EP1663917 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF CUMENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Council of Scientific and Industrial Research Rafi Marg New Delhi 100 001 / IN | [2010/04] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states COUNCIL OF SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH Rafi Marg New Delhi 100 001 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOKADE, Vijay Vasant, National Chemical Laboratory Pune 411 008 Maharashtra / IN | 02 /
KHARUL, Ulhas, Kanhaiyalal National Chemical Laboratory Pune 411 008 / IN | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Manaton, Ross Timothy Bromhead Johnson LLP 57-59 High Street Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Manaton, Ross Timothy Bromhead Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03818406.5 | 29.08.2003 | [2006/23] | WO2003IN00291 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005021469 | Date: | 10.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1663917 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1663917 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07C2/86 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
C07C2/864 (EP);
C07C2529/08 (EP);
Y02P20/52 (EP);
Y02P20/582 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C2/864, C07C15/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | 29.03.2006 | LT | 29.03.2006 | LV | 29.03.2006 | MK | 29.03.2006 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CUMOL | [2010/02] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF CUMENE | [2006/23] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DU CUMENE | [2006/23] |
Former [2006/23] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CUMEN | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 22.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.01.2010 | BE | 27.01.2010 | CY | 27.01.2010 | CZ | 27.01.2010 | DK | 27.01.2010 | EE | 27.01.2010 | FI | 27.01.2010 | IT | 27.01.2010 | NL | 27.01.2010 | RO | 27.01.2010 | SE | 27.01.2010 | SI | 27.01.2010 | SK | 27.01.2010 | TR | 27.01.2010 | BG | 27.04.2010 | GR | 28.04.2010 | ES | 08.05.2010 | PT | 27.05.2010 | HU | 28.07.2010 | GB | 29.08.2010 | IE | 29.08.2010 | LU | 29.08.2010 | CH | 31.08.2010 | FR | 31.08.2010 | LI | 31.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 27.01.2010 | |
BE | 27.01.2010 | ||
CY | 27.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2010 | ||
DK | 27.01.2010 | ||
EE | 27.01.2010 | ||
FI | 27.01.2010 | ||
IT | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
RO | 27.01.2010 | ||
SE | 27.01.2010 | ||
SI | 27.01.2010 | ||
SK | 27.01.2010 | ||
BG | 27.04.2010 | ||
GR | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.05.2010 | ||
PT | 27.05.2010 | ||
HU | 28.07.2010 | ||
GB | 29.08.2010 | ||
IE | 29.08.2010 | ||
LU | 29.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
FR | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 27.01.2010 | |
BE | 27.01.2010 | ||
CY | 27.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2010 | ||
DK | 27.01.2010 | ||
EE | 27.01.2010 | ||
FI | 27.01.2010 | ||
IT | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
RO | 27.01.2010 | ||
SE | 27.01.2010 | ||
SI | 27.01.2010 | ||
SK | 27.01.2010 | ||
BG | 27.04.2010 | ||
GR | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.05.2010 | ||
PT | 27.05.2010 | ||
HU | 28.07.2010 | ||
GB | 29.08.2010 | ||
IE | 29.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
FR | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | AT | 27.01.2010 | |
BE | 27.01.2010 | ||
CY | 27.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2010 | ||
DK | 27.01.2010 | ||
EE | 27.01.2010 | ||
FI | 27.01.2010 | ||
IT | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
RO | 27.01.2010 | ||
SE | 27.01.2010 | ||
SI | 27.01.2010 | ||
SK | 27.01.2010 | ||
BG | 27.04.2010 | ||
GR | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.05.2010 | ||
PT | 27.05.2010 | ||
GB | 29.08.2010 | ||
IE | 29.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
FR | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 27.01.2010 | |
BE | 27.01.2010 | ||
CY | 27.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2010 | ||
DK | 27.01.2010 | ||
EE | 27.01.2010 | ||
FI | 27.01.2010 | ||
IT | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
RO | 27.01.2010 | ||
SE | 27.01.2010 | ||
SI | 27.01.2010 | ||
SK | 27.01.2010 | ||
BG | 27.04.2010 | ||
GR | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.05.2010 | ||
PT | 27.05.2010 | ||
IE | 29.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
FR | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 27.01.2010 | |
BE | 27.01.2010 | ||
CY | 27.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2010 | ||
DK | 27.01.2010 | ||
EE | 27.01.2010 | ||
FI | 27.01.2010 | ||
IT | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
RO | 27.01.2010 | ||
SE | 27.01.2010 | ||
SI | 27.01.2010 | ||
SK | 27.01.2010 | ||
BG | 27.04.2010 | ||
GR | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.05.2010 | ||
PT | 27.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 27.01.2010 | |
BE | 27.01.2010 | ||
CY | 27.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2010 | ||
DK | 27.01.2010 | ||
EE | 27.01.2010 | ||
FI | 27.01.2010 | ||
IT | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
RO | 27.01.2010 | ||
SE | 27.01.2010 | ||
SI | 27.01.2010 | ||
SK | 27.01.2010 | ||
BG | 27.04.2010 | ||
GR | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.05.2010 | ||
PT | 27.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 27.01.2010 | |
BE | 27.01.2010 | ||
CY | 27.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2010 | ||
DK | 27.01.2010 | ||
EE | 27.01.2010 | ||
FI | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
RO | 27.01.2010 | ||
SE | 27.01.2010 | ||
SI | 27.01.2010 | ||
SK | 27.01.2010 | ||
BG | 27.04.2010 | ||
GR | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.05.2010 | ||
PT | 27.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 27.01.2010 | |
BE | 27.01.2010 | ||
CY | 27.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2010 | ||
EE | 27.01.2010 | ||
FI | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
RO | 27.01.2010 | ||
SE | 27.01.2010 | ||
SI | 27.01.2010 | ||
SK | 27.01.2010 | ||
BG | 27.04.2010 | ||
GR | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.05.2010 | ||
PT | 27.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 27.01.2010 | |
BE | 27.01.2010 | ||
CY | 27.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2010 | ||
EE | 27.01.2010 | ||
FI | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
RO | 27.01.2010 | ||
SE | 27.01.2010 | ||
SI | 27.01.2010 | ||
SK | 27.01.2010 | ||
GR | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.05.2010 | ||
PT | 27.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 27.01.2010 | |
FI | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
SI | 27.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.05.2010 | ||
PT | 27.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 27.01.2010 | |
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
SI | 27.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.05.2010 | ||
PT | 27.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 27.01.2010 | |
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.05.2010 | ||
PT | 27.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 27.01.2010 | |
ES | 08.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 27.01.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0537389 (COUNCIL SCIENT IND RES [IN]) [A] 1-29* the whole document *; | [A]EP0538518 (COUNCIL SCIENT IND RES [IN]) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0162692 (PHENOLCHEMIE GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-29 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 4 * * page 4, line 14 - line 17 * * claim - * |