EP1663130 - EXTRACT OF NELUMBINIS SEMEN FOR THE TREATMENT OF DEPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Purimed Co., Ltd. 4th Floor, Minjoktongil Bldg. 325-52, Imun 2(i)-dong Dongdaemun-gu Seoul 130-831 / KR | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIN, Min-kyu 312-99, Hwigyeong-dong Dongdaemoon-gu Seoul 130-090 / KR | 02 /
HONG, Moo-chang 22-1601 Miseong A.P.T. 408, Apgujeong-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-110 / KR | 03 /
BAE, Hyeon-su 21-218, Hanshin City Officetel, Jamwon-dong Schocho-gu, Seoul 137-030 / KR | 04 /
YOON, Jeong-hwan 5-1006 Samho A.P.T. Indeokwon 442-2, Poil-dong Uiwang-si Gyeonggi-do 437-830 / KR | 05 /
KANG, Moon-kyu 301-2202 Buyeong A.P.T. 2-1, Donong-Dong Namnyangju-si Gyeonggi-do 472-100 / KR | 06 /
OH, Jung-wan 108-1202 Sambu A.P.T. Sujin-dong, Sujeong-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 461-180 / KR | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Gill, Siân Victoria, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Gill, Siân Victoria, et al Venner, Shipley & Co 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03818419.8 | 28.08.2003 | [2006/23] | WO2003KR01743 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005021021 | Date: | 10.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1663130 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1663130 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/317, A23G4/06, A23G9/42, A23L1/30, A61K36/62 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
A61K36/62 (EP,US);
A23G4/068 (EP,US);
A23G9/42 (EP,US);
A23L13/65 (EP,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A61K36/185 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/322, A23V2250/21 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/21, A23V2200/324 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2006/23] | A61K8/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXTRAKT AUS NELUMBINIS SAMEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DEPRESSION | [2006/23] | English: | EXTRACT OF NELUMBINIS SEMEN FOR THE TREATMENT OF DEPRESSION | [2006/23] | French: | EXTRAIT DE SEMEN NELUMBINIS POUR TRAITER LA DEPRESSION | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 23.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 30.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.09.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   07.09.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.01.2009 | BE | 21.01.2009 | CY | 21.01.2009 | CZ | 21.01.2009 | DK | 21.01.2009 | EE | 21.01.2009 | FI | 21.01.2009 | IT | 21.01.2009 | NL | 21.01.2009 | RO | 21.01.2009 | SI | 21.01.2009 | SK | 21.01.2009 | TR | 21.01.2009 | BG | 21.04.2009 | SE | 21.04.2009 | GR | 22.04.2009 | ES | 02.05.2009 | PT | 22.06.2009 | HU | 22.07.2009 | IE | 28.08.2009 | LU | 28.08.2009 | CH | 31.08.2009 | LI | 31.08.2009 | MC | 31.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
IT | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
HU | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 28.08.2009 | ||
LU | 28.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
IT | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
IE | 28.08.2009 | ||
LU | 28.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
IT | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
IE | 28.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
IE | 28.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
IE | 28.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 21.01.2009 | |
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | NL | 21.01.2009 | |
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | NL | 21.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08295632 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002098253 (RILEY PATRICIA A [US]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0054] *; | [X]WO02102397 (KOREA RES INST CHEM TECH [KR], et al) [X] 1-8 * example 1(2) *; | [X]CN1406624 (HUANG GU [CN]) [X] 1-8* abstract *; | [X]JP2003113100 (POLA CHEM IND INC) [X] 1-8 * example 1; claim 4 *; | [X] - "MEDICINAL COMPOSITION WITH NOURISHING AND TRANQUILIZING PROPERTIES FOR IMPROVING SLEEP", DERWENT, Derwent World Patents Index, (19000101), Database accession no. 2003-524190, XP002405083 [X] 1-8 * column A * | [X] - P.K. MUKHERJEE K. SAHA R. BALASUBRAMANIAN M. PAL B.P. SAHA, "Studies on psychopharmacological effects of Nelumbo nucifera Gaertn. rhizome extract", JOURNAL OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, (1996), vol. 54, pages 63 - 67, XP002405105 [X] 1-8 * paragraph [004.] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-8741(96)01455-9 | International search | [A]KR20020015540 (KIM SANG KUEN [KR]); | [XE]KR20030079104 (PURIMED CO LTD [KR]); | [AE]KR20040026175 (UNIV KYUNG HEE, et al); | [A] - MUKHERJEE, P.K. ET AL., "Studies on psychopharmacological effects of Nelumbo nucifera Gaertn.rhizome extract", J. ETHNOPHARMACOL, (1996), vol. 54, pages 63 - 67, XP002987531 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-8741(96)01455-9 | [A] - SHOJI, N. ET AL., "Asimilobine and lirinidine, serotonergic receptor antagonists, from Nelumbo nucifera", J.NAT.PROD., (1987), vol. 50, no. 4, pages 773 - 774, XP002999293 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/np50052a044 | Examination | DE19619512 |