EP1662958 - SQUEEGEE FOR SURFACE CLEANING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pulex S.R.L. Via Maternini, 89/A 25133 Mompiano / IT | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUIZZI, Giulio, Pulex S.r.l. Via Maternini, N.8 25060 Mompiano / IT | [2013/17] |
Former [2006/23] | 01 /
GUIZZI, Giulio, Pulex S.r.l. Via Maternini, N.8 25060 Mompiano / IT | Representative(s) | Crippa, Paolo Ernesto, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Crippa, Paolo Ernesto, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria 11 25122 Brescia / IT | ||
Former [2006/23] | Crippa, Paolo Ernesto, et al JACOBACCI & PARTNERS S.p.A. Piazzale Arnaldo, 2 25121 Brescia / IT | Application number, filing date | 03818519.5 | 09.09.2003 | [2006/23] | WO2003IT00541 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005023075 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1662958 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1662958 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47L1/06 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
A47L1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Title | German: | RAKEL FÜR DIE OBERFLÄCHENREINIGUNG | [2006/23] | English: | SQUEEGEE FOR SURFACE CLEANING | [2006/23] | French: | RACLETTE POUR NETTOYAGE DE SURFACE | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 27.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.02.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.09.2003 | AT | 24.04.2013 | BE | 24.04.2013 | CY | 24.04.2013 | CZ | 24.04.2013 | DK | 24.04.2013 | EE | 24.04.2013 | FI | 24.04.2013 | MC | 24.04.2013 | NL | 24.04.2013 | RO | 24.04.2013 | SE | 24.04.2013 | SI | 24.04.2013 | SK | 24.04.2013 | TR | 24.04.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | GR | 25.07.2013 | ES | 04.08.2013 | PT | 26.08.2013 | GB | 09.09.2013 | IE | 09.09.2013 | LU | 09.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | FR | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
TR | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
GB | 09.09.2013 | ||
IE | 09.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
GB | 09.09.2013 | ||
IE | 09.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
GB | 09.09.2013 | ||
IE | 09.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
IE | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 26.08.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPH09154776 ; | [A]US559023 (M. J. BARRON); | [A]US1628783 (JBNSEN ADOLPH C, et al); | [A]US2328287 (MARTIN JOHN W); | [XA]US3892005 (BERNS HARALD) [X] 1,9,10 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 33 * * figure -; claim - * [A] 11; | [A]US4336624 (PICHELMAN FRANKLIN D, et al); | [XA]US5930863 (SAMUELSSON SOREN [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 62 - column 4, line 54 * * column 5, line 14 - column 6, line 29 * * figure - * [A] 2-11 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09154776 A 19970617 (NIPPON WAIPABUREEDE KK) [X] 1,11 * abstract * [A] 2-10 |