EP1677403 - MOTOR DRIVE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | 29.07.2011 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Mitsubishi-Electric Industrial Systems Corporation 13-16, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0073 / JP | [2006/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOYODA, Masaru c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/27] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/27] | Popp, Eugen, et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03818786.0 | 26.09.2003 | [2006/27] | WO2003JP12327 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005031939 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1677403 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/01 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
H02P9/02 (EP,US);
H02J3/01 (EP,US);
H02J3/46 (EP,US);
H02M1/12 (EP);
H02J3/38 (EP,US);
Y02E40/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/25] | H02J3/01, H02P5/74 | ||
Former IPC [2006/27] | H02J3/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [2007/01] |
Former [2006/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSYSTEM | [2006/27] | English: | MOTOR DRIVE SYSTEM | [2006/27] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR | [2006/27] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2005 | Translation filed | 01.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 21.07.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/35] | 28.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPS63148865 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPH03112317 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JPH07322629 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD); | [Y]JPH09201056 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]WO02100716 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) |