EP1687383 - FLUOROPOLYMER LOW REFLECTING LAYERS FOR POLASTIC LENSES AND DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWATO, Satoko 4-27-8 Jinguumae Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 150-0001 / JP | 02 /
KAKU, Mureo 2-40-7, Toyosatodai Utsunomiya, Tochigi 320-003 / JP | 03 /
FEIRING, Andrew, Edward 7 Buckridge Drive Wilmington, DE 19807 / US | 04 /
USCHOLD, Ronald, Earl 1104 Doset Drive West Chester, PA 19382 / US | 05 /
WHELAND, Robert, Clayton 510 Twaddell Mill Road Wilmington, DE 19807 / US | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | Matthews, Derek Peter, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03818978.3 | 07.10.2003 | [2006/32] | WO2003US32090 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005044939 | Date: | 19.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1687383 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1687383 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C09D127/16, C09D127/12 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
C03C17/28 (EP,US);
C08F214/18 (EP,US);
C08F214/28 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C09D127/16 (EP,US);
G02B1/111 (EP,US);
C08J2427/00 (EP,US);
Y02E60/32 (US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/02] |
Former [2006/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REFLEXIONSARME SCHICHTEN AUS FLUOROPOLYMER FÜR KUNSTSTOFFLINSEN UND -GEGENSTÄNDE | [2006/32] | English: | FLUOROPOLYMER LOW REFLECTING LAYERS FOR POLASTIC LENSES AND DEVICES | [2006/32] | French: | COUCHES FLUOROPOLYMERES FAIBLEMENT REFLECHISSANTES POUR LENTILLES ET DISPOSITIFS EN PLASTIQUE | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 16.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 07.10.2009 | IT | 07.10.2009 | FR | 02.11.2009 | [2011/14] |
Former [2011/01] | GB | 07.10.2009 | |
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | FR | 02.11.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB871582 (DU PONT) [X] 8-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US3023187 (SHEN LO ELIZABETH) [X] 8-12 * column 8, line 73 - column 9, line 3; claims 1-3 *; | [X]FR1350581 (DU PONT) [X] 8-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US3194796 (NOONAN SQUIRE EDWARD) [X] 8-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US3235537 (RICHARD ALBIN JERRY, et al) [X] 13-16 * column 4, lines 71-75; example 12 *; | [X]GB1395609 (TEIJIN LTD) [X] 8-12 * comparative examples 2, 7 and 9 *; | [X]US4123603 (STEWART JR CLARE A) [X] 1-7 * column 2, line 33; claim - *; | [X]US4335238 (MOORE ALBERT L, et al) [X] 1-7 * example 2 * * column 6, lines 46-48 *; | [A]US4395445 (GEBAUER GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 13-16* claim - *; | [A]DE3227045 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 13-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US4546141 (GEBAUER GERHARD [DE]) [A] 13-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US4764431 (PIACENTI FRANCO [IT], et al) [X] 8-12 * example 1 *; | [X]EP0365933 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [X] 8-12 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO0055130 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * example 19; claim - *; | [X]WO0137043 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 8-12 * claims 10-13 *; | [X]US2002094440 (LLANOS GERARD H [US], et al) [X] 8-12 * examples 3-5 *; | [X]US2003166807 (HARRISON DAVID B [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * table 2 * * page 3, paragraph 52 *; | [X]US2003170455 (TSUDA NOBUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * example 10; claim - * |