EP1536145 - Blowing fan and refrigerator having the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Dong Il 10/4, 686-49, Sindaebang-Dong, Dongjak-Gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Shin, Hyoun Jeong 854-7, Mansu 3-Dong, Namdong-Gu Incheon / KR | [2005/22] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 04000123.2 | 07.01.2004 | [2005/22] | Priority number, date | KR20030086015 | 29.11.2003 Original published format: KR 2003086015 | [2005/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1536145 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1536145 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | [2005/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1536145 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/38, F04D29/66 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
F04D29/668 (EP,US);
F04D29/38 (KR);
F04D29/34 (EP,US);
F25D17/062 (EP,US);
F25D2317/0681 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/30] |
Former [2005/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lüfter und Kühlschrank mit demselben | [2005/22] | English: | Blowing fan and refrigerator having the same | [2005/22] | French: | Ventilateur et réfrigérateur comprenant celui-ci | [2005/22] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2004 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 02.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5304037 (SCOFIELD ROBERT L [US]) [X] 1,4,5 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 18; figures 1,4 *; | [X]US2002034443 (SONG SUNG BAE [KR]) [X] 1* paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0015]; figure 3a *; | [X]US2003024264 (JUNG YOUNG GYU [KR], et al) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0019]; figures 1,3 * |