EP1426570 - Low friction variable valve actuation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2004/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pierik, Ronald Jay 26 Royal View Drive Rochester NY 14625-1142 / US | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Denton, Michael John Delphi European Headquarters 64 avenue de la Pleine de France Paris Nord II B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2004/24] | Denton, Michael John Delphi Automotive Systems, Centre Technique Paris, 64 Avenue de la Plaine de France, B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04000193.5 | 01.06.2001 | [2004/24] | Priority number, date | US20000215253P | 30.06.2000 Original published format: US 215253 P | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1426570 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Classification | IPC: | F01L13/00 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
F01L13/0005 (EP);
F01L13/0026 (EP);
F01L13/0063 (EP);
F01L2013/0073 (EP);
F01L2305/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/24] | Title | German: | Mechanismus zur variablen Ventilsteuerung mit geringer Reibung | [2004/24] | English: | Low friction variable valve actuation device | [2004/24] | French: | Dispositif à basse friction pour commande variable de soupape | [2004/24] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01202103.6 / EP1167705 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |