Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1426570 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US21525300 | 30.06.2000 | EP01202103 | 01.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6439177 | 27.08.2002 | B2 | US2002007810 | 24.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21525300 | 30.06.2000 | US87085501 | 30.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1167705 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2004 | B1 | EP1167705 | 13.11.2002 | A3 | EP1167705 | 02.01.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US21525300 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60108004T | 02.06.2005 | T2 | DE60108004D1 | 03.02.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US21525300 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Earlier application | EP1167705 |