EP1437627 - Toner feeder and elelctrophotographic image forming apparatus using the toner feeder and toner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/29] | Toner feeder, toner, and elelctrophotographic image forming apparatus using the toner feeder and toner | ||
[2004/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2012/34] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Ricoh Company 1-3-6, Nakamagome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masuda, Minoru c/o Ricoh Comp. Ltd. 1-3-6, Nakamagome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
Sugiura, Hideki c/o Ricoh Comp. Ltd. 1-3-6, Nakamagome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
Umemura, Kazuhiko c/o Ricoh Comp. Ltd. 1-3-6, Nakamagome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 04 /
Suzuki, Tomomi c/o Ricoh Comp. Ltd. 1-3-6, Nakamagome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 05 /
Mochizuki, Satoshi c/o Ricoh Comp. Ltd. 1-3-6, Nakamagome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2012/34] |
Former [2004/29] | 01 /
Masuda, Minoru c/o Ricoh Comp. Ltd. 1-3-6, Nakamagome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | ||
02 /
Sugiura, Hideki c/o Ricoh Comp. Ltd. 1-3-6, Nakamagome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | |||
03 /
Umemura, Kazuhiko c/o Ricoh Comp. Ltd. 1-3-6, Nakamagome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | |||
04 /
Suzuki, Tomomi c/o Ricoh Comp. Ltd. 1-3-6, Nakamagome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | |||
05 /
Mochizuki, Satoshi c/o Ricoh Comp. Ltd. 1-3-6, Nakamagome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/29] | Barz, Peter, Dr. Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04000254.5 | 08.01.2004 | [2004/29] | Priority number, date | JP20030003171 | 09.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003003171 | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1437627 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1437627 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/08, G03G15/08 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
G03G9/0827 (EP,US);
G03G15/0822 (EP,US);
G03G9/0821 (EP,US);
G03G9/0825 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/14] |
Former [2004/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Toner-Zuführvorrichtung, elektrophotographisches Gerät mit Toner-Zuführvorrichtung und Toner | [2012/17] | English: | Toner feeder and elelctrophotographic image forming apparatus using the toner feeder and toner | [2012/17] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation en toner et appareil électrophotographique avec dispositif d'alimentation en toner. | [2012/17] |
Former [2004/29] | Toner-Zuführvorrichtung, Toner, elektrophotographisches Gerät mit Toner-Zuführvorrichtung und Toner | ||
Former [2004/29] | Toner feeder, toner, and elelctrophotographic image forming apparatus using the toner feeder and toner | ||
Former [2004/29] | Toner, dispositif d'alimentation en toner et appareil électrophotographique avec dispositif d'alimentation en toner. | Examination procedure | 25.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 13.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.04.2012 | 17.04.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.08.2012 | NL | 22.08.2012 | ES | 03.12.2012 | [2013/23] |
Former [2013/22] | NL | 22.08.2012 | |
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | NL | 22.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003005428 ; | [X]EP0475332 (MITA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 2,4,5* figure 4 *; | [X]EP0886187 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1 * page 32, line 3 * * page 37, line 26 - page 38; example 1 *; | [X]US5885743 (TAKAYANAGI HITOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 35; example 1 * * column 36, line 56 - line 61 * * column 38; examples 1,3,4; table 2 * * column 37, line 53 *; | [X]US6159647 (ANNO MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 16, line 23 - line 24; examples 1-7; table 3 * * claim 1 *; | [X]EP1087265 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]) [X] 1 * page 12; example 1 * * page 16, line 31 - line 32; claim 1 *; | [X]US6291123 (OHNO YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * claim 12 *; | [X]EP1253480 (RICOH KK [JP]) [X] 2-5 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0024] * * claim 22 * * paragraph [0032] * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030512), vol. 2003, no. 05, & JP2003005428 A 20030108 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0475332 | EP1087265 | JP2002139906 | JP2002139902 | EP1253480 |