EP1439069 - Ink tank with capillary member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2008 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department Xerox Square - 20 A 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, NY 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | ||
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carrese, Edward M. 240 S. Goodman Street, Apr. 702 Rochester NY 14607 / US | 02 /
Breemes, David P., Sr. 3657 South Townline Road, Lot No. 19 Palmyra New York 14522 / US | 03 /
Cook, Michael 351B East Main Street Waterloo New York 13165 / US | 04 /
Baxendell, Douglas J. 52 Stewart Street, Apt. 3 Rochester New York 14620 / US | [2004/30] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04000661.1 | 14.01.2004 | [2004/30] | Priority number, date | US20030248382 | 15.01.2003 Original published format: US 248382 | [2004/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1439069 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1439069 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
B41J2/17513 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/15] |
Former [2004/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tintenbehälter mit Kapillarselement | [2004/30] | English: | Ink tank with capillary member | [2004/30] | French: | Réservoir d'encre avec membre capillaire | [2004/30] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 09.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0581531 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X]WO0149495 (IPLEMB CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-10 * pages 3-5; figure 2 * |