EP1415571 - Advanced backpack system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gordini U.S.A. Inc. 67 Allen Martin Drive Essex Junction Vermont 05451 / US | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Gordini U.S.A. Inc. 67 Allen Martin Drive Essex Junction, Vermont 05451 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gellis, David 3956 Avenue Du Park Montreal Quebec, H2L 3M7 / CA | 02 /
Van Roost, Oli 5781 Sherbrooke W. No. 2 Montreal Quebec, H4A 1X2 / CA | 03 /
Shaanan, Gad 49 Oakland Avenue Westmounth Quebec, H3Y 1P1 / CA | 04 /
Duval, Francois 256 Ste. Marie Terrebonne Quebec, J6W 3E3 / CA | 05 /
Brousseau, Ivan 4457 Bourbonniere Montreal Quebec, H1X 2M3 / CA | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 04000790.8 | 16.10.2000 | [2004/19] | Priority number, date | US19990159442P | 14.10.1999 Original published format: US 159442 P | US19990160313P | 19.10.1999 Original published format: US 160313 P | US19990161026P | 25.10.1999 Original published format: US 161026 P | US19990161042P | 25.10.1999 Original published format: US 161042 P | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1415571 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1415571 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1415571 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A45F3/04 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
A45F3/047 (EP);
A45F2003/045 (EP);
A45F2003/125 (EP);
A45F3/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/19] | Title | German: | Verbessertes Rucksacksystem | [2004/19] | English: | Advanced backpack system | [2004/19] | French: | Système évolué de sac à dos | [2004/19] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 28.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00309079.2 / EP1092362 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.02.2008 | BE | 13.02.2008 | CY | 13.02.2008 | DK | 13.02.2008 | FI | 13.02.2008 | IT | 13.02.2008 | NL | 13.02.2008 | SE | 13.05.2008 | GR | 14.05.2008 | ES | 24.05.2008 | PT | 14.07.2008 | IE | 16.10.2008 | LU | 16.10.2008 | CH | 31.10.2008 | LI | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.10.2008 | ||
LU | 16.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 13.02.2008 | |
ES | 24.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9311999U (NESLER STEFAN [DE]) [A] 8,10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2697732 (ROSSIGNOL SA [FR]) [A] 8,9* abstract *; | [XA]FR2706119 (ROSSIGNOL SA [FR]) [X] 30,32,33 * page 4, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 * [A] 6,7,13; | [XY]FR2717992 (FONTAINE SPORTS SARL [FR]) [X] 1-5,13,14,18,32 * page 3, line 22 - page 6, line 10; figures 2A,3A,3B,3C,4 * [Y] 8-12; | [Y]US5547461 (LEVIS JEFFREY D [US]) [Y] 8-12 * abstract *; | [A]US5570824 (LYON SCOTT B [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5,14,32 * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 8; figures 5,6 * |