EP1557297 - Portable anti-skid device for tires of motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cavaletto, Silvio 151, Corso Indipendenza 10086 Rivarolo Canavese (Torino) / IT | [2005/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | Aprà, Mario Aprà Brevetti Via Bertola 2 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Aprà, Mario Aprà Brevetti Via Bertola 2 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2005/30] | Aprà, Mario Aprà Brevetti, 2, Via Bertola 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 04001040.7 | 20.01.2004 | [2005/30] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1557297 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60C27/04 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
B60C27/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/16] |
Former [2005/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tragbare Gleitschutzeinrichtung für Fahrzeugreifen | [2005/30] | English: | Portable anti-skid device for tires of motor vehicles | [2005/30] | French: | Dispositif portatif antidérapage pour roues de véhicules automobiles | [2005/30] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/42] | 01.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.03.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.03.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3547176 (KROKEN ARNE, et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * column 1 - column 2; figure -; claim - *; | [X]AT317012B (ELKEM SPIGERVERKET AS) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [X]US4209049 (REGENSBURGER JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * abstract * * column 2 - column 3 * * figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP0147272 (GOURHANT ROBERT) [X] 1-7 * page 19, lines 1-3 * * page 22, line 10 - page 23, line 15 * * figure -; claim - *; | [X]DE29724130U (KEMENYFOELDI ANDRAS [HU], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * pages 5-8 ** figure -; claim - * |