EP1439404 - Multi-optical axis photoelectric sensors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keyence Corporation 1-3-14, Higashinakajima, Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 533-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states Keyence Corporation 1-3-14, Higashinakajima, Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 533-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakaguchi, Tomikazu, c/o Keyence Corp. 3-14-1 Higashinakajima, Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 533-8555 / JP | [2004/30] | Representative(s) | Leidescher, Thomas, et al Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Leidescher, Thomas, et al Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/30] | Leidescher, Thomas, Dr., et al Zimmermann & Partner, Postfach 33 09 20 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04001109.0 | 20.01.2004 | [2004/30] | Priority number, date | JP20030010825 | 20.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003010825 | [2004/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1439404 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1439404 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01V8/20 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
G01V8/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/46] |
Former [2004/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fotoelektrische Sensoren mit mehreren optischen Achsen | [2004/30] | English: | Multi-optical axis photoelectric sensors | [2004/30] | French: | Capteurs photo-électriques à axes optiques multiples | [2004/30] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 08.09.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/09] | 17.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5003169 (SAKAGUCHI TOMIKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-19 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 24 * * column 4, line 7 - line 14 * * column 4, line 43 - line 59 * * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 2 * * column 5, line 14 - line 38 * * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 2 * * column 8, line 48 - column 9, line 16 * * column 10, line 36 - column 11, line 14 * * figures 1-14,21,24,25,32,33 *; | [X]WO0054077 (SCIENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-19 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 17 * * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 2 * * page 8, line 4 - line 9 * * page 10, line 30 - line 37 * * page 15, line 31 - line 37 * * figures 1b,3a,9a *; | [A]US2002017604 (NAKAZAKI TAKAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0061] , [0062] , [0069] - [0072] * * figures 2-5 *; | [A]US6414603 (YAMAGUCHI AKIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 11, line 9 - line 14 ** figure 12 * |