EP1471486 - Time based encryption algorithm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.01.2007 [2007/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jiraki, Khalil No. 3687 - 2nd Floor, J. Utamaz - Fortune CT. Rasam Jay 70300, Seremban / MY | [2004/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Hainz, Miloslav Traplova - Hakr - Kubat Pristavni 24 170 00 Praha 7 / CZ | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | Hainz, Miloslav, Dipl.-Ing. Traplova - Hakr - Kubat, Pristavni 24 170 00 Praha 7 / CZ | Application number, filing date | 04001194.2 | 21.01.2004 | [2004/44] | Priority number, date | MY20030000377 | 31.01.2003 Original published format: MY 0300377 | [2004/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1471486 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1471486 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/30, H04L9/00, G11B20/18, G09C1/00 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
H04L9/34 (EP,US);
H04L9/12 (EP,US);
G11B20/0021 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/44] | G09C1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Title | German: | Zeitbasierter Verschlüsselungsalgorithmus | [2004/44] | English: | Time based encryption algorithm | [2004/44] | French: | Algorithme de chiffrement basé sur le temps | [2004/44] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/05] | 14.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.09.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4341045 (LISZIEWICZ ANTAL DR [DE]) [A] 4 * page 1, line 43 - page 2, line 65 ** page 3, line 19 - line 46 *; | [A]US6275587 (AMERIGE STEPHEN KELLEY [US]) [A] 4 * abstract * * column 1, line 60 - column 7, line 13 * * figures 2,2A,3A,4A,5A *; | [Y] - ABDEL-GHAFFAR KHALED A S ET AL, "Bounds and constructions for runlength-limited error-control block codes", IEEE TRANS INF THEORY; IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY MAY 1991, (199105), vol. 37, no. 3 part II, pages 789 - 800, XP002351317 [Y] 4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/18.79948 | [Y] - GILLES ZEMOR, "Cours de Cryptograpie", CASSINI, PARIS, (2000), ISBN 2-84225-020-6, pages 189 - 200, XP002351582 [Y] 4 * page 189, column 200 * | [A] - BEENKER G F M ET AL, "GENERALIZED METHOD FOR ENCODING AND DECODING RUN-LENGTH-LIMITED BINARY SEQUENCES", IEEE TRANS INF THEORY SEP 1983, (198309), vol. IT-29, no. 5, pages 751 - 754, XP002351318 [A] 4 * page 751, column R - page 753, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIT.1983.1056728 |