EP1477888 - Interferometer based navigation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avago Technologies ECBU IP (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. No. 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states Avago Technologies ECBU IP (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. No 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | ||
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Xie, Tong 4022 Lylewood Court San Jose CA 95121 / US | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Nußbaumstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/12] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2004/47] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04001237.9 | 21.01.2004 | [2004/47] | Priority number, date | US20030439674 | 16.05.2003 Original published format: US 439674 | [2004/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1477888 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1477888 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
G06F3/0317 (EP,US);
G06F3/03543 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2007/09] |
Former [2004/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Navigationsgerät basiert auf Interferometer | [2004/47] | English: | Interferometer based navigation device | [2004/47] | French: | Appareil de navigation basé sur Interféromètre | [2004/47] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/42] | 28.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4794384 (JACKSON STEPHEN B [US]) [X] 1,4,5,9,10 * abstract * * column 2, lines 34-52 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 62 * * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 12 * * claims 1,2 * [Y] 6,7; | [A]WO9946603 (OTM TECHNOLOGIES LTD [CY], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 7, line 12 - page 11, line 31 * * page 31, line 18 - page 33, line 32 ** page 46, line 25 - page 48, line 31 *; | [XY]WO0217222 (IBM [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-12 * abstract * * page 4, lines 30-37 * * page 5, lines 23-39 * * page 6, lines 21-35 * [Y] 6,7 |