EP1452827 - Apparatus comprising a pig movable in a tube and a position detector for said pig [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/36] | Position detector for a part movable in a tube | ||
[2010/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisenmann AG Tübinger Strasse 81 71032 Böblingen / DE | [2011/07] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states EISENMANN Anlagenbau GmbH & Co. KG Tübinger Strasse 81 71032 Böblingen / DE | ||
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states EISENMANN Lacktechnik GmbH & Co. KG Tübinger Strasse 81 71032 Böblingen / DE | ||
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Eisenmann Lacktechnik KG, (Komplementär: Eisenmann-Stiftung) Tübinger Strasse 81 71032 Böblingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ucan, Aydin Kreuzstrasse 8 71634 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Ostertag, Ulrich, et al Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestrasse 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | Ostertag, Ulrich, et al Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte Eibenweg 10 70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04001547.1 | 26.01.2004 | [2004/36] | Priority number, date | DE2003109142 | 28.02.2003 Original published format: DE 10309142 | [2004/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1452827 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1452827 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1452827 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01B7/02, G01B7/14, G01D5/14, G01R33/02 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
G01V15/00 (EP,US);
B05B12/1481 (EP,US);
B05B5/1616 (EP,US);
G01D5/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI, SE [2006/22] |
Former [2004/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung mit einem in einem Rohr bewegbaren Molch und einem Positionsdetektor für den Molch | [2010/45] | English: | Apparatus comprising a pig movable in a tube and a position detector for said pig | [2010/45] | French: | Dispositif comprenant une navette mobile dans un tube et un capteur de position pour ladite navette | [2010/46] |
Former [2004/36] | Positionsdetektor für ein in einem Rohr bewegtes Teil | ||
Former [2004/36] | Position detector for a part movable in a tube | ||
Former [2004/36] | Capteur de position pour une partie mobile dans un tube | Examination procedure | 27.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 24.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.07.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 23.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.04.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.04.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.04.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 24.04.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.04.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 24.04.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.04.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.04.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.04.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.04.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 24.04.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.04.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.04.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.04.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.04.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.04.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.04.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.04.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.04.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 24.04.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.04.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.04.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3920981 (IST MOLCHTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,8 * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 16; figures 1,2 * [A] 3-7,9; | [XA]US5035021 (LE DEVEHAT EUGENE [FR]) [X] 1-3,8,9 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 21; figure 1 * * column 5 - lines 27,28 * [A] 4-7; | [XA]DE4341810 (FESTO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * column 3, lines 6-27; figure 1 *[A] 3,9; | [XA]US5451870 (HUANG ZHEN DIPL ING [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,8 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 29; figures 1-3 * [A] 4-7,9; | [XA]US6014789 (KNAPP KENNETH M [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 43; figure 1 * * column 6, lines 4-12; figure 6 * [A] 3,7; | [XA]EP1158275 (SAGEM [FR]) [X] 1-3,8 * paragraphs [0018] - [0029]; figures 1,2 * [A] 4-7,9 |