EP1443542 - Method and device for controlling the edge of a disc shaped arcticle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.2009 [2009/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2008/09] |
Former [2004/32] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Binder, Alfred Lukasweg 11 9023 Landskron / AT | 02 /
Kroupa, Gerhard Waldheimstrasse 2 9500 Villach / AT | 03 /
von Koblinski, Carsten, Dr. Fabriksteig 10/6 9500 Villach / AT | 04 /
Matschitsch, Martin Suetschach 195 9181 Feistritz i. Ros / AT | [2004/43] |
Former [2004/32] | 01 /
Binder, Alfred Lukasweg 11 9023 Landskron / AT | ||
02 /
Kroupa, Gerhard Waldheimstrasse 2 9500 Villach / AT | |||
03 /
von Koblinski, Karsten, Dr. Fabriksteig 10/6 9500 Villach / AT | |||
04 /
Matschitsch, Martin Suetschach 195 9181 Feistritz i. Ros / AT | Representative(s) | Kindermann, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Kindermann Postfach 10 02 34 85593 Baldham / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | Kindermann, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kindermann Patentanwälte Karl-Böhm-Strasse 1 85598 Baldham / DE | Application number, filing date | 04001554.7 | 26.01.2004 | [2004/32] | Priority number, date | DE2003103459 | 29.01.2003 Original published format: DE 10303459 | [2004/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1443542 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1443542 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | [2005/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1443542 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
H01L21/681 (EP);
G01N21/9503 (EP);
H01L21/67288 (EP);
H01L21/68707 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/35] |
Former [2004/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Kontrollieren des Randes eines scheibenförmigen Gegenstandes | [2004/32] | English: | Method and device for controlling the edge of a disc shaped arcticle | [2004/32] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le contrôle du bord d'objects circulaires | [2004/32] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 07.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5238354 (VOLOVICH VLADIMIR W R [US]) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 40; figures 1,3 * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 44 *; | GB2314037 [ ] (WESTERN ATLAS UK LTD [GB]) [ ] * abstract * * page 27 - page 31 ** page 34 - page 35 *; | [X]GB2337111 (UNOVA UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * page 15 - page 17; claim - *; | [X]EP1001460 (WACKER SILTRONIC HALBLEITERMAT [DE]) [X] 1-18 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0021]; figures 2-5 * |