EP1450270 - System and method of distributing replication commands [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2004/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guo, Qun 18670 N.E. 55th Way Redmond Washington 98052 / US | 02 /
Habben, Michael E. 2101 205th Avenue S.E. Sammamish Washington 98075 / US | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04001736.0 | 27.01.2004 | [2004/35] | Priority number, date | US20030370389 | 19.02.2003 Original published format: US 370389 | [2004/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1450270 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1450270 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | [2005/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1450270 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
G06F16/27 (EP,US);
B65H75/406 (KR);
G06F16/275 (US);
B65H2402/51 (KR);
B65H2701/33 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/35] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren für die Verteilung von Replikationsbefehlen | [2004/35] | English: | System and method of distributing replication commands | [2004/35] | French: | Système et procédé pour distribuer des commandes de réplication | [2007/49] |
Former [2004/35] | Système et Procédé pour distribuer des commandes de réplication | Examination procedure | 01.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 20.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.05.2008 | BE | 07.05.2008 | CY | 07.05.2008 | CZ | 07.05.2008 | DK | 07.05.2008 | EE | 07.05.2008 | FI | 07.05.2008 | NL | 07.05.2008 | RO | 07.05.2008 | SI | 07.05.2008 | SK | 07.05.2008 | TR | 07.05.2008 | BG | 07.08.2008 | SE | 07.08.2008 | GR | 08.08.2008 | ES | 18.08.2008 | PT | 07.10.2008 | HU | 08.11.2008 | IE | 27.01.2009 | LU | 27.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
GR | 08.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
HU | 08.11.2008 | ||
IE | 27.01.2009 | ||
LU | 27.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
GR | 08.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
IE | 27.01.2009 | ||
LU | 27.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
GR | 08.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
IE | 27.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
IE | 27.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | SI | 07.05.2008 | |
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 07.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0177841 (NETWORK APPLIANCE INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * page 7, line 11 - page 9, line 11 * * page 13, line 5 - page 18, line 16 * * claim 14 *; | [A]US2002165724 (BLANKESTEIJN BARTUS C [NL]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 14 - page 5, paragraph 73 ** figures 1,2 * |