Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] |
10.07.2009 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
10.07.2009 | Change - inventor | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
10.07.2009 | Change - French title | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
08.07.2009 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
08.07.2009 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
18.03.2009 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
06.02.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.08.2008 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
01.08.2008 | Change - German title | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] |
18.04.2008 | Definitive list of designations | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
12.04.2008 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
14.02.2008 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
07.02.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.11.2007 | First examination report | |
06.11.2007 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
12.10.2007 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
10.08.2007 | Publication of search report | published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] |
07.02.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.02.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.07.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] |