EP1455064 - Belt drive for engine accessories with a friction wheel drive with a controller and a accessory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/37] | Friction wheel drive cooperating with a belt drive for engine accessories, for a separately arranged accessory | ||
[2008/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2004/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wimmer, Rudolf Tröstlberg 74 4431 Haidershofen / AT | 02 /
Fössl, Peter Poststrasse 39 4441 Behamberg / AT | 03 /
Wieser, Philipp Droissendorf 24 4521 Schiedlberg / AT | 04 /
Lemberger, Heinz Hofäckerallee 1 85774 Unterföhring / DE | [2009/33] |
Former [2004/37] | 01 /
Wimmer, Rudolf Tröstlberg 74 4431 Haidershofen / AT | ||
02 /
Fössel, Peter Poststrasse 39 4441 Behamberg / AT | |||
03 /
Wieser, Phillip Droissendorf 24 4521 Schiedlberg / AT | |||
04 /
Lemberger, Heinz Hofäckerallee 1 85774 Unterföhring / DE | Application number, filing date | 04001909.3 | 29.01.2004 | [2004/37] | Priority number, date | DE2003109061 | 03.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10309061 | [2004/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1455064 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1455064 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1455064 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F02B67/06, F16H13/10, F16H7/02 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
F02B67/06 (EP);
F16H13/10 (EP);
F16H7/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/21] |
Former [2004/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aggregate-Riementrieb einer Brennkraftmaschine mit einem Reibradgetriebe mit Steuereinrichtung und Nebenaggregat | [2008/36] | English: | Belt drive for engine accessories with a friction wheel drive with a controller and a accessory | [2008/36] | French: | Entraînement à courroie d'un moteur avec entraînement par friction de roue avec un contrôleur et un accessoire de moteur | [2009/33] |
Former [2004/37] | Mit einem Aggregate-Riementrieb einer Brennkraftmaschine zusammenwirkendes Reibradgetriebe für ein gesondert angeordnetes Nebenaggregat | ||
Former [2004/37] | Friction wheel drive cooperating with a belt drive for engine accessories, for a separately arranged accessory | ||
Former [2004/37] | Entraînement par friction de roue coopérant avec entraînement à courroie pour des accessoires d'un moteur, pour un accessoire de moteur arrangé séparement | Examination procedure | 28.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 08.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1810126U (HENSCHEL WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE3934884 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE4039206 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [L]WO2004048808 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE], et al) | by applicant | DE10255075 |