EP1487002 - Electrical remote actuation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2006 [2006/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEWISS S.p.A. Via Alessandro Volta, 1 24069 Cenate Sotto (Bergamo) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Gewiss S.P.A. Via Alessandro Volta, 1 24069 Cenate Sotto (Bergamo) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bosatelli, Domenico Via Alessandro Volta 1 24069 Cenate Sotto / IT | 02 /
Pianezzola, Sergio Via della Fratellanza, 21 21100 Calcinate del Pesce(Varese) / IT | 03 /
Contardi, Augusto Via Rovani, 7 21100 Varese / IT | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Forattini, Amelia, et al Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Forattini, Amelia, et al c/o Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 04002046.3 | 30.01.2004 | [2004/51] | Priority number, date | IT2003MI00991 | 20.05.2003 Original published format: IT MI20030991 | [2004/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1487002 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1487002 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/70, H01H5/16 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
H01H5/16 (EP);
H01H71/70 (EP);
H01H71/46 (EP);
H01H9/281 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/39] |
Former [2004/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrische Fernbedienung | [2004/51] | English: | Electrical remote actuation device | [2004/51] | French: | Dispositif électrique d'actionnement à distance | [2004/51] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/16] | 10.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.08.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.08.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0797229 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA [FR]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]EP1137037 (AEG NIEDERSPANNUNGSTECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2* the whole document *; | [X]US2002100674 (ROSEN JAMES LAWRENCE [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 4; claim 1 * |