EP1444930 - Curtain rail comprising two supports and a rail [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leuschen, Wolfgang Stuttgarter Strasse 75 71735 Eberdingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states Leuschen, Wolfgang Stuttgarter Strasse 7 71735 Eberdingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/33] | Representative(s) | Fleck, Hermann-Josef Jeck, Fleck & partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | Fleck, Hermann-Josef, Dr.-Ing. Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 04002522.3 | 05.02.2004 | [2004/33] | Priority number, date | DE20032002011U | 08.02.2003 Original published format: DE 20302011 U | [2004/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1444930 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1444930 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47H1/102, A47H1/142 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
A47H1/102 (EP);
A47H1/142 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/33] | A47H1/102 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/33] | Title | German: | Vorhangschiene aus zwei Halteelementen und einer Schiene | [2004/33] | English: | Curtain rail comprising two supports and a rail | [2004/33] | French: | Rail de rideau comprenant deux supports et un rail | [2004/33] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 20.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.04.2007 | 26.04.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/10] | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB190905353 (EVERED & CO LTD, et al) [X] 1,4,12* page 4, line 11 - line 19; figures 10-12 *; | [X]GB191029006 (RUSSELL HAROLD RIDLEY) [X] 1-4 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 14; figures 1-5 *; | [X]GB136307 (ALLEN ALFRED JOHN, et al) [X] 1,4-7,13 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 7; figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB224275 (EDWIN GEORGE CLEVERLY) [X] 1,4,8-10,14 * page 3, line 79 - line 104 * * page 4, line 16 - line 72; figures 1,5-7 *; | [X]FR2603790 (LEMANCHEC FRANCIS [FR]) [X] 1,4,11 * the whole document * |