EP1475401 - Mono-, oligo- and polymers comprising fluorene and aryl groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2009/22] |
Former [2004/46] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heeney, Martin 59 Cedar Road Southampton SO14 6TQ / GB | 02 /
Tierney, Steven 33 Bellemoor Road Southampton SO15 7QW / GB | 03 /
Thomson, Marcus 7 Caroline Avenue Mudeford Christchurch BH23 3JR Dorset / GB | 04 /
McCulloch, Iain, Dr. 2 Goodacre Drive Chandlers Ford Southampton SO53 4LG / GB | [2004/46] | Application number, filing date | 04002898.7 | 10.02.2004 | [2004/46] | Priority number, date | EP20030004925 | 07.03.2003 Original published format: EP 03004925 | [2004/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1475401 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1475401 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1475401 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/08, C09K11/06, C07D333/16, C08G61/02, C08G61/12, C07D333/08, C07D333/12 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
C08G61/126 (EP);
C07D333/18 (EP);
C08G61/02 (EP);
C09K11/06 (EP);
C08G2261/1424 (EP);
C08G2261/3142 (EP);
C08G2261/3223 (EP);
C09K2211/1425 (EP);
C09K2211/1433 (EP);
C09K2211/1458 (EP);
H10K85/113 (EP);
H10K85/115 (EP);
H10K85/151 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/46] | C08G61/08, C09K11/06, C07D333/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/46] | Title | German: | Fluorene und Arylgruppen enthaltende Mono-, Oligo- und Polymere | [2004/46] | English: | Mono-, oligo- and polymers comprising fluorene and aryl groups | [2004/46] | French: | Monomères, oligomères et polymères comprenant des groupes fluorène et aryle. | [2004/46] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/46] | 18.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.05.2009 | BE | 27.05.2009 | CY | 27.05.2009 | CZ | 27.05.2009 | DK | 27.05.2009 | EE | 27.05.2009 | FI | 27.05.2009 | IT | 27.05.2009 | NL | 27.05.2009 | RO | 27.05.2009 | SI | 27.05.2009 | SK | 27.05.2009 | TR | 27.05.2009 | BG | 27.08.2009 | SE | 27.08.2009 | GR | 28.08.2009 | ES | 07.09.2009 | PT | 27.09.2009 | HU | 28.11.2009 | IE | 10.02.2010 | LU | 10.02.2010 | CH | 28.02.2010 | LI | 28.02.2010 | FR | 01.03.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CY | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IT | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
HU | 28.11.2009 | ||
IE | 10.02.2010 | ||
LU | 10.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CY | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IT | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
HU | 28.11.2009 | ||
IE | 10.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CY | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IT | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
IE | 10.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IT | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
IE | 10.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
IE | 10.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0046321 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-15* claims 1,2 *; | [A]US6495273 (HWANG DO HOON [KR], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,2 *; | [PX]EP1323762 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [PX] 1,2,19-22 * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0092]; claim 1 *; | [X] - TIRAPATTUR ET AL., "Spectroscopic Study of Intermolecular Interactions in Various Oligofluorenes: Precursors of Light-Emitting Polymers", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 106, pages 8959 - 8966, XP002321534 [X] 1-4,7-11 * figure TFTWC * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp0143544 | Examination | - ASAWAPIROM ET AL, "Dialkylfluoerene-Oligothiophene and Dialkylfluorene-Dithienylvinylene Alternating Copolymers", SYNTHESIS, (2002), vol. 9, pages 1136 - 1142, XP001537816 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2002-32523 | - MCKENN ET AL, "Stucture-property relationship for alpha, omega-dialkyl substituted thiphene/fluorene based oligomers", POLYMER PREPRINTS, (2003), vol. 44, no. 2, page 441 | by applicant | EP1323762 | - S. TIRAPATTUR ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM. B, (2002), vol. 106, pages 8959 - 8966 | - MCKENN ET AL., POLYMER PREPRINTS, (2003), vol. 44, no. 2, page 441 | - P. BÄUERLE ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS. 2, (1993), page 489 | - B. LIU ET AL., MACROMOLECULES, (2000), vol. 33, page 8945 |