EP1421885 - High speed variable size toaster [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE FRYMASTER CORPORATION 8700 Line Avenue, P.O. Box 5100 Shreveport, LA 71135-1000 / US | [2007/05] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states THE FRYMASTER CORPORATION 8700 Line Avenue, P.O. Box 5100 Shreveport, LA 71135-1000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jones, Douglas 4538 Weasel Drive New Port Richey 34653 Florida / US | 02 /
Day, William 1013 Hagen Drive New Port Richey 34654 Florida / US | 03 /
Harter, David 12609 Lacy Drive New Port Richey 34654 Florida / US | 04 /
Sank, Gerald W 1801 Maplewood Court Palm Harbour 34684 Florida / US | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Mounteney, Simon James MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 04003117.1 | 08.08.2000 | [2004/22] | Priority number, date | US19990147119P | 04.08.1999 Original published format: US 147119 P | [2004/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1421885 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1421885 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/08 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
A21B1/245 (EP,US);
A47J37/0857 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/22] | Title | German: | Schneller Toaster mit variablen Dimensionen | [2004/22] | English: | High speed variable size toaster | [2004/22] | French: | Toaster grande vitesse aux dimensions variables | [2004/22] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 21.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 12.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00952507.2 / EP1199963 | Opposition(s) | 01.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/02] | Request for further processing for: | 13.12.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 12.12.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.12.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3736860 (VISCHER A) [X] 1,3-5 * the whole document * [A] 2; | [XA]US4556043 (BRATTON RONALD E [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 54; figure 3 * [A] 3; | [A]US4739154 (BHARARA MANMOHAN S [US], et al) [A] 1,3-5* column 4, line 23 - column 6, line 11; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4951648 (SHUKLA KAILASH C [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 3, line 29 - column 7, line 30; figures 4-6,9 *; | [XA]US6192877 (MOSHONAS GEORGES [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 14; figures 1-5 * [A] 3 |