EP1447635 - Heat exchanger for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei Corporation 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome, Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei Corporation 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome, Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Toshiharu c/o Calsonic Kansei Corp., 5-24-15, Minamidai Nakano-ku, Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | 02 /
Kamiyama, Naohisa c/o Calsonic Kansei Corp., 5-24-15, Minamidai Nakano-ku, Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | 03 /
Suematsu, Nobuyasu c/o Calsonic Kansei Corp., 5-24-15, Minamidai Nakano-ku, Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | [2004/34] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04003156.9 | 12.02.2004 | [2004/34] | Priority number, date | JP20030036770 | 14.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003036770 | JP20030039931 | 18.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003039931 | [2004/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1447635 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/04, F28F9/02, F28D9/00 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
F16H57/0415 (EP,US);
F28D1/0417 (EP,US);
F28D1/0452 (EP,US);
F28F9/0202 (EP,US);
F28F9/0246 (EP,US);
F28F9/0253 (EP,US);
F25B2339/044 (EP,US);
F28D2021/0084 (EP,US);
F28D2021/0089 (EP,US);
F28F2270/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/19] |
Former [2004/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2004/34] | English: | Heat exchanger for vehicle | [2004/34] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur pour automobiles | [2004/34] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 13.02.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0599107 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0855566 (CALSONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10 * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0857935 (CALSONIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * figures 1,3 *; | [A]JPH10281688 (CALSONIC CORP) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [Y]US2002023735 (UCHIKAWA AKIRA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [PY]WO03106910 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [PY] 1-10 * figure 1 * |