EP1447038 - Bath tub [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blome, Josef Am Stadtwall 3 33181 Bad Wünnenberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Blome, Josef Am Stadtwall 3 D-33181 Bad Wünnenberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/34] | Representative(s) | Ostermann, Thomas Fiedler, Ostermann & Schneider Patentanwälte Klausheider Strasse 31 33106 Paderborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | Ostermann, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Fiedler, Ostermann & Schneider, Klausheider Strasse 31 33106 Paderborn / DE | Application number, filing date | 04003247.6 | 13.02.2004 | [2004/34] | Priority number, date | DE2003202501U | 14.02.2003 Original published format: DE 20302501 U | [2004/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1447038 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1447038 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/022, A47K3/00 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
A47K3/006 (EP);
A47K3/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/34] | A47K3/022 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/38] |
Former [2004/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wanne | [2004/34] | English: | Bath tub | [2004/34] | French: | Baignoire | [2004/34] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/40] | 25.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.08.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.08.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4802247 (LEICHLE ROLAND G [FR], et al) [X] 1,4,9,10* figures 1,3 *; | [X]EP0457093 (MOBIL BAD AG [CH]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * column 6, line 46 - column 8, line 12; figures 2a,2b *; | [X]US6499153 (SIMONI IADER [IT], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10 * column 4, line 1 - line 8; figures 1-8; claim 9 * | by applicant | DE9107749U | DE9301082U |