EP1450543 - Communication system, address management method, relay device, and management device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
Former [2011/14] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishida, Katsutoshi NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Okagawa, Takatoshi NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
Jo, Manhee NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2011/14] |
Former [2004/35] | 01 /
Nishida, Katsutoshi NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
02 /
Okagawa, Takatoshi NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
03 /
Jo, Manhee NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04003398.7 | 16.02.2004 | [2004/35] | Priority number, date | JP20030040185 | 18.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003040185 | [2004/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1450543 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1450543 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | [2008/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1450543 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/12 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
H04L61/2521 (EP,US);
H04L61/45 (EP,US);
H04L61/2553 (EP,US);
H04W8/08 (EP,US);
H04W60/06 (EP,US);
H04W8/26 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2009/27] |
Former [2004/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kommunikationssystem, Verfahren zur Verwaltung von Adressen, Relaisvorrichting und Verwaltungsgerät | [2004/35] | English: | Communication system, address management method, relay device, and management device | [2004/35] | French: | Système de communication, procédé de gestion d' adresses, dispositif de relais et dispositif de gestion | [2004/35] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 23.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - OKAGAWA T ET AL, IP Packet transport procedures in IP, PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2002 IEICE SOCIETY CONFERENCE, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS, PAGE(S) 521 - 522, (20020101), XP008095139 [X] 1-15 * page 521, column R, paragraph 2 - paragraph 8 * * page 522, column L, paragraph 1 - column R, paragraph 3 * * page 522, column R, paragraph 4 - paragraph 8 * * figure 2 * * figure 3 * * figure 4 * | [X] - VADALI R ET AL, Agent-basead route optimization for mobile IP, VTC FALL 2001. IEEE 54TH. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. PROCEEDINGS. ATLANTIC CITY, NJ, OCT. 7 - 11, 2001; [IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, PAGE(S) 2731 - 2735, (20011007), ISBN 978-0-7803-7005-0, XP010562472 [X] 1-15 * page 2732, column L, paragraph 3 - page 2733, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 2733, column R, paragraph 3 - page 2734, column L, paragraph 6 * * figure 1 * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VTC.2001.957257 | [X] - NO H OHNISHI Y TAKAGI NTT CORPORATIONIETF S, Mobile IP Border Gateway (MBG) | [A] - CHARLES PERKINS SUN MICROSYSTEMS DAVID B JOHNSON CARNEGIE MELLON UNIVERSITY, Route Optimization in Mobile IP; draft-ietf-mobileip-optim-07.txt, IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (19971120), ISSN 0000-0004, XP015023439 [A] 1-15 * page 8, paragraphs CH,4.3,BINDING,UPDATE,MESSAGE - page 11, paragraphs CH,4.4,BINDING,ACKNOWLEDGE,MESSAGE * | [A] - C-Y LEE G MORROW F KADRI, Intercepting Location Updates; draft-lmk-mobileip-intercepting-update 00.txt, IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20000701), ISSN 0000-0004, XP015031765 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |