EP1500972 - Apparatus for projecting advertising pictures in combination with a main projection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Top Immagine S.r.L. Via E. De Angeli, 51 24028 Ponte Nossa (Prov. of Bergamo) / IT | [2005/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferri, Carlo Via Adua, 1 21040 Carnago (Prov. of Varese) / IT | [2005/04] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/04] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati, Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 04003509.9 | 17.02.2004 | [2005/04] | Priority number, date | IT2003MI01506 | 22.07.2003 Original published format: IT MI20031506 | [2005/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1500972 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/00, G09F19/18 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
G09F19/18 (EP);
G03B21/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | IT [2005/41] |
Former [2005/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gerät zur Projektion von Werbebildern in Kombination mit einem Hauptprojektionssystem | [2005/04] | English: | Apparatus for projecting advertising pictures in combination with a main projection system | [2005/04] | French: | Appareil de projection d'images publicitaires en combinaison avec un système de projection principal | [2005/04] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 27.07.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.11.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 08.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.08.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB753926 (LUCIEN LEPELLEY) [A] 1-8 * claim 1 *; | [A]US3718388 (BOUDOURIS A, et al) [A] 1,6* abstract *; | [A]EP1103845 (HILTMANN JOERG [DE]) [A] 1,6 * claim 1 * |