EP1455185 - Liquid chromatograph mass spectrometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation 24-14, Nishishimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | For all designated states Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation 24-14, Nishishimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | ||
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation 24-14, Nishishimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Shinya 11-1-413, Aoba-cho Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-0056 / JP | 02 /
Deguchi, Kisaburo 1-37-905, North 23, West 5 Kita-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 001-0023 / JP | [2012/15] |
Former [2004/37] | 01 /
Ito, Shinya 11-1-413, Aoba-cho Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-0056 / JP | ||
02 /
Deguchi, Kisaburo 1-37-905, North 23, West 5 Kita-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 001-0023 / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2012/15] |
Former [2004/37] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04003527.1 | 17.02.2004 | [2004/37] | Priority number, date | JP20030059985 | 06.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003059985 | [2004/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1455185 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1455185 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/46 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
G01N30/463 (EP,US);
G01N2030/027 (EP,US);
G01N2030/121 (EP,US);
G01N2030/8411 (EP,US);
G01N30/468 (EP,US);
G01N30/7233 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
G01N2030/121, G01N30/466 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2005/21] |
Former [2004/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flüssigchromatographmassenspektrometer | [2004/37] | English: | Liquid chromatograph mass spectrometer | [2004/37] | French: | Chromatographe en phase liquide et spectromètre de masse | [2004/37] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 13.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0190722 (HOCER [FR], et al) [A] 1,4* column A; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1202054 (BRUKER BIOSPIN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4 * column A; figure 4 *; | [A] - WAGNER K ET AL, "AN AUTOMATED ON-LINE MULTIDIMENSIONAL HPLC SYSTEM FOR PROTEIN AND PEPTIDE MAPPING WITH INTEGRATED SAMPLE PREPARATION", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (20020215), vol. 74, no. 4, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 809 - 820, XP001115830 [A] 1,4 * column A; figure 1 * * page 811, column 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph L * * page 813, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac010627f | [A] - KROCK K A ET AL, "RECENT ADVANCES IN MULTIDIMENSIONAL GAS CHROMATOGRAPHY", TRAC, TRENDS IN ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY. CAMBRIDGE, GB, (1994), vol. 13, no. 1, ISSN 0165-9936, pages 13 - 17, XP000417702 [A] 1,4 * page 14; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-9936(94)85054-2 | Examination | - OPITECK G J ET AL, "TWO-DIMENSIONAL SEC/RPLC COUPLED TO MASS SPECTROMETRY FOR THE ANALYSIS OF PEPTIDES", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19970701), vol. 69, no. 13, doi:10.1021/AC961156D, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 2283 - 2291, XP000696556 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac961156d | by applicant | JPS62255865 |