EP1566640 - Sampling device, the method and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ani Biotech Oy Museokatu 13 B 00100 Helsinki / FI | [2005/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niskanen, Aimo Peipontie 2 02660 Espoo / FI | 02 /
Saramäki, Mika Eräkatu 5 03620 Karkkila / FI | [2005/34] | Representative(s) | Lönnqvist, Gunnel Solveig Kristina, et al Borenius & Co Oy AB Tallberginkatu 2 A 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Lönnqvist, Gunnel Solveig Kristina, et al Borenius & Co Oy Ab Tallberginkatu 2 A 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2005/34] | Lönnqvist, Gunnel Solveig Kristina, et al Borenius & Co Oy Ab Tallberginkatu 2A FIN-00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 04003603.0 | 18.02.2004 | [2005/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1566640 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/558, G01N33/543, B01L3/00 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
G01N33/558 (EP);
B01L3/5029 (EP,US);
G01N33/54388 (US);
G01N2001/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/34] | Extension states | AL | 18.02.2004 | LT | 18.02.2004 | LV | 18.02.2004 | MK | 18.02.2004 | Title | German: | Probenahmevorichtung, Methode und deren Verwendung | [2005/34] | English: | Sampling device, the method and use thereof | [2005/34] | French: | Dispositif d' échantillonnage, méthode et leur utilisation | [2005/34] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2004 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 25.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/34] | 04.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.06.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO8603839 (CERNY ERICH H); | [A]DE4439429 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]US6180395 (SKIFFINGTON RICHARD [US], et al); | [X]US2002160538 (GUIRGUIS RAOUF [US]); | [A]WO03016903 (PILS WALTER [AT], et al); | [A]US6548309 (MOORE NORMAN JAMES [US], et al) |