EP1462726 - Illuminable switch-panel for household appliance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2011/17] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fleissner, Reinhard Adalbert-Stifter-Strasse 17 83352 Altenmarkt / DE | 02 /
Huber, Ernst Herzog-Otto-Strasse 31 83308 Trostberg / DE | 03 /
Meierhofer, Rudolf Siedlerstrasse 13 83352 Altenmarkt / DE | [2004/40] | Application number, filing date | 04003687.3 | 18.02.2004 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | DE2003113049 | 24.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10313049 | [2004/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1462726 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1462726 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | [2007/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1462726 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F24C7/08, F24C15/06, H01H9/02, B32B27/28, G09F13/08, B60R11/02 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
F24C7/082 (EP);
H01H9/182 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/40] | F24C7/08, F24C15/06, H01H9/02, B32B27/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/40] | Title | German: | Geräteblende mit beleuchtbarer Anzeigevorrichtung | [2004/40] | English: | Illuminable switch-panel for household appliance | [2004/40] | French: | Panneau d'un commutateur illuminable, pour appareils électro-domestiques | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 15.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.02.2004 | CY | 27.04.2011 | CZ | 27.04.2011 | DK | 27.04.2011 | EE | 27.04.2011 | FI | 27.04.2011 | IE | 27.04.2011 | NL | 27.04.2011 | RO | 27.04.2011 | SE | 27.04.2011 | SI | 27.04.2011 | SK | 27.04.2011 | BG | 27.07.2011 | GR | 28.07.2011 | PT | 29.08.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/29] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 29.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]DE10143485 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [PA] 1* claim 1 * |