EP1420022 - Use of substituted pyridino pentaazamacrocyle complexes having superoxide dismutase activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/21] | Substituted pyridino pentaazamacrocyle complexes having superoxide dismutase activity | ||
[2006/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | [2007/27] |
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states MONSANTO COMPANY 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riley, Dénnis 1722, Claymont Estates Drive Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | 02 /
Neumann, William L. 2251 Argonne Meadows Lake St. Louis, Missouri 63367 / US | 03 /
Henke, Susan L. 123 Parsons Avenue Webster Groves, MO 63119 / US | 04 /
Lennon, Patrick 50 Wilshire Terrace Webster Groves, MO 63119 / US | 05 /
Ashton, Karl W. 19040 Sunflower Ridge Lane Pacific, MO 63069 / US | 06 /
Sikorski, James A. 535 Glengate Cove Atlanta, Georgia 30328 / US | 07 /
Salvemini, Daniela 1820 Orchard Hills Drive Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | 08 /
Foblan, Yvette 1260 Fiddle Creek Road Labadie, MO 63069 / US | 09 /
Grapperhaus, Lanahan 518 Nancy Court Troy, IL 62294 / US | 10 /
Kusturin, Carrie L. 913 Chancellor Drive Edwardsville, IL 62025 / US | [2004/44] |
Former [2004/28] | 01 /
Riley, Dénnis 1722, Claymont Estates Drive Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | ||
02 /
Neumann, William L. 844, Reindeer Ballwin, MO 63021 / US | |||
03 /
Henke, Susan L. 123 Parsons Avenue Webster Groves, MO 63119 / US | |||
04 /
Lennon, Patrick 50 Wilshire Terrace Webster Groves, MO 63119 / US | |||
05 /
Ashton, Karl W. 19040 Sunflower Ridge Lane Pacific, MO 63069 / US | |||
06 /
Sikorski, James A. 535 Glengate Cove Atlanta, Georgia 30328 / US | |||
07 /
Salvemini, Daniela 1820 Orchard Hills Drive Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | |||
08 /
Foblan, Yvette 1260 Fiddle Creek Road Labadie, MO 63069 / US | |||
09 /
Grapperhaus, Lanahan 518 Nancy Court Troy, IL 62294 / US | |||
10 /
Kusturin, Carrie L. 913 Chancellor Drive Edwardsville, IL 62025 / US | |||
Former [2004/27] | 01 /
Riley, Dénnis 1722, Claymont Estates Drive Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | ||
02 /
Neumann, William L. 844, Reindeer Ballwin, MO 63021 / US | |||
03 /
Henke, Susan L. 123 Parsons Avenue Webster Groves, MO 63119 / US | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/21] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof, Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04003746.7 | 14.09.2000 | [2004/21] | Priority number, date | US19990398120 | 16.09.1999 Original published format: US 398120 | [2004/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1420022 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1420022 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/22, A61K31/44, A61P29/00 | [2007/06] | CPC: |
C07D471/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/555 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P39/00 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2004/21] | C07D487/22, A61K31/44, A61P29/00, // (C07D487/22, 257:00, 209:00, 209:00, 209:00, 209:00) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/21] | Title | German: | Verwendung von substituierten Pyridinopentaazamakrozyklen-Komplexen mit Superoxiddismutaseaktivität | [2007/46] | English: | Use of substituted pyridino pentaazamacrocyle complexes having superoxide dismutase activity | [2006/47] | French: | Utilisation de complexes de pyridinopentaazamacrocycle substitués à activité de superoxyde dismutase | [2006/47] |
Former [2004/21] | Substituierte Pyridino pentaaazamykrozykle Komplexe mit Superoxiddismutaseaktivität | ||
Former [2004/21] | Substituted pyridino pentaazamacrocyle complexes having superoxide dismutase activity | ||
Former [2004/21] | Complexes de pyridinopentaazamacrocycle substitué à activité de superoxyde dismutase | Examination procedure | 19.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 18.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00966722.1 / EP1212323 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.07.2007 | BE | 04.07.2007 | CH | 04.07.2007 | CY | 04.07.2007 | DK | 04.07.2007 | FI | 04.07.2007 | LI | 04.07.2007 | NL | 04.07.2007 | IE | 14.09.2007 | LU | 14.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | GR | 05.10.2007 | PT | 04.12.2007 | [2016/23] |
Former [2010/23] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CY | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
IE | 14.09.2007 | ||
LU | 14.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CY | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
IE | 14.09.2007 | ||
LU | 14.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CY | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
IE | 14.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
IE | 14.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 04.07.2007 | |
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 04.07.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9858636 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * abstract *; | [PX] - UDIPI K ET AL, "Modification of inflammatory response to implanted biomedical materials in vivo by surface bound superoxide dismutase mimics", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS RESEARCH, WILEY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (2000), vol. 51, no. 4, ISSN 0021-9304, pages 549 - 560, XP002255242 [PX] 1,4 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1097-4636(20000915)51:4<549::AID-JBM2>3.0.CO;2-Z |