EP1471028 - Manual unlocking device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/06] | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55, Postfach 6052 Hergiswil / CH | ||
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55, Postfach CH-6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kocher, Johannes Sonnmatt 12 6044 Udligenswil / CH | [2004/44] | Application number, filing date | 04004001.6 | 23.02.2004 | [2004/44] | Priority number, date | EP20030405151 | 05.03.2003 Original published format: EP 03405151 | [2004/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1471028 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1471028 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B66B13/24, E05B17/14 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
B66B5/005 (EP,US);
B66B13/24 (EP,US);
B66B13/245 (EP,US);
E05B17/147 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Title | German: | Einrichtung für die manuelle Entriegelung | [2004/44] | English: | Manual unlocking device | [2004/44] | French: | Dispositif pour le déverrouillage manuel | [2004/44] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 16.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.02.2007 | SI | 07.02.2007 | IE | 23.02.2007 | LU | 23.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | BG | 08.05.2007 | HU | 08.08.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | CY | 07.02.2007 | |
SI | 07.02.2007 | ||
IE | 23.02.2007 | ||
LU | 23.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 08.05.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 07.02.2007 | |
SI | 07.02.2007 | ||
IE | 23.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 08.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | SI | 07.02.2007 | |
IE | 23.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 08.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | SI | 07.02.2007 | |
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 08.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | SI | 07.02.2007 | |
BG | 08.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | BG | 08.05.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0859151 ; | [A]JP2000072361 ; | [A]EP1030008 (DECAYEUX ETS [FR]) [A] 6-8* abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 1996, no. 07, & JP08059151 A 19960305 (MITSUBISHI DENKI BILL TECHNO SERVICE KK) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000922), vol. 2000, no. 06, & JP2000072361 A 20000307 (HITACHI BUILDING SYSTEMS CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |