EP1453041 - Optical disk recording method and apparatus using alternative strategies of laser beam control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1 Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2007/27] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakajo, Yukihisa 108 City Winds Higashitotsuka 624-1, Hirato-Cho Totsuka-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 244-0803 / JP | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Emde, Eric, et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | Emde, Eric, et al Wagner & Geyer, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04004236.8 | 25.02.2004 | [2004/36] | Priority number, date | JP20030050551 | 27.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003050551 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1453041 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1453041 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | [2006/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1453041 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/0045 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
G11B7/1267 (EP,US);
G11B20/12 (EP,US);
G11B7/00456 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/36] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsvorrichtung und -Verfahren für optische Datenträger mittels alternativer Strategien für Laserstrahlsteurung | [2004/41] | English: | Optical disk recording method and apparatus using alternative strategies of laser beam control | [2004/36] | French: | Dispositif et procédé d' enregistrement de disque optique utilisant de strategie alternatifs pour réglage d' un faisceau laser | [2004/41] |
Former [2004/36] | Aufzeichnungsvorrichtung und -verfahren für optische Datenträger mittels alternativer Strategien für Laserstrahlsteuerung | ||
Former [2004/36] | Dispositif et procédé d'enregistrement de disque optique utilisant des strategies alternatifs pour réglage d'un faisceau laser | Examination procedure | 25.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 24.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 31.07.2009 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 18.08.2009 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.09.2009 | BE | 23.09.2009 | BG | 23.09.2009 | CY | 23.09.2009 | CZ | 23.09.2009 | DK | 23.09.2009 | EE | 23.09.2009 | FI | 23.09.2009 | IT | 23.09.2009 | NL | 23.09.2009 | RO | 23.09.2009 | SE | 23.09.2009 | SI | 23.09.2009 | SK | 23.09.2009 | TR | 23.09.2009 | GR | 24.12.2009 | ES | 03.01.2010 | PT | 25.01.2010 | IE | 25.02.2010 | LU | 25.02.2010 | CH | 28.02.2010 | LI | 28.02.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | HU | 24.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
BG | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
IT | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
IE | 25.02.2010 | ||
LU | 25.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
HU | 24.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
BG | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
IT | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
IE | 25.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
HU | 24.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
BG | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
IT | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
IE | 25.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
IT | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
IE | 25.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
IE | 25.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 23.09.2009 | |
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 23.09.2009 | |
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 23.09.2009 | |
SE | 23.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002080702 (ASADA AKIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]US6414932 (KAKU TOSHIMITSU [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US6504806 (NAKAJO YUKIHISA [JP]) [A] 1-16; | [PA]US2003058765 (SCHREURS GERARD ELISE NOEL [BE], et al) [PA] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [P]US2003142603 (NAKAJO YUKIHISA [JP]) [P] 1-16; | [PA]US2003223331 (SHIRAISHI TAKUYA [JP], et al) [PA] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004213106 (PEREIRA DAVID M [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1484753 (RICOH KK [JP]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2005029472 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [E] 1-16 * the whole document * |