EP1568696 - Compounds as inhibitors of cell proliferation and viral infections [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 4SC AG Am Klopferspitz 19 a 82152 Martinsried / DE | [2005/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leban, Johann Dr. c/o 4SC AG Am Klopferspitz 19a 82152 Martinsried / DE | 02 /
Schmitt, Harald Fuststrasse 8 55116 Mainz / DE | [2005/35] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2005/35] | Application number, filing date | 04004381.2 | 26.02.2004 | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1568696 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D263/10, A61K31/422, A61P35/00 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
C07D263/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/20] |
Former [2005/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbindungen als Inhibitoren der Zellproliferation und den viralen Infektionen | [2005/35] | English: | Compounds as inhibitors of cell proliferation and viral infections | [2005/35] | French: | Composés comme inhibiteurs de prolifération de cellules et d'infections virales | [2005/35] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/49] | 05.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.04.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.04.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPS52106865 [ ] (TEIKOKU HORMONE MFG CO LTD); | JPS5555160 [ ] (TEIKOKU HORMONE MFG CO LTD); | [X]EP0709225 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * A15. A24 *; | [X]JPH08142523 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD) [X] 1 * A-41, A-42, A-43 *; | [X]WO9640673 (SUGEN INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6 * example 4 * * claims 1,11 *; | [X]WO9740028 (VERTEX PHARMA [US]) [X] 1-6 * Table IB, examples 80-82 * * claims 12,13 *; | [A]WO02070467 (4SC AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,4-6 * claim - *; | [X] - CHEMCATS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, XP002290758 [X] 1 * Order Numbers: ZT-0731785, ZT-0720195, ZT-0729041, T0508-7758, T0508-2739. T0508-2584, T0508-2581, T0508-2580, T0508-2574 * | [PX] - CHEMCATS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, XP002290759 [PX] 1 * Order Numbers: T0508-7758, T0508-2739, T0508-2584, T0508-2581, T0508-2580, T0508-2574, T0519-1036 * | [X] - "N-(1'-Ethyl-2'-pyrrolidinylmethyl)-2-methoxy-5-sulfamoylbenzoic acid amide", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 93:186157, URL: STN, XP002290760 [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - TSUKAMOTO, KUNIO ET AL, "5-(3-Halo- or ethylaminopropyl)-2-o-methoxyphenyl-4,5- dihydrooxazoles", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 88:105310, URL: STN, XP002290761 [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - Handbook of Fine Chemicals and Laboratory Equipment, ZWIJNDRECHT, ALDRICH, (2003), XP002290757 [X] 1 * benzene, page 158 * | [X] - JOSEPH DANIEL, D.N. DHAR, "Reactions of Chlorosilfonyl Isocyanate with Thiazolines and Oxazolines: Formation of Thiazolo and Oxazolothiadiazines", SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, (1993), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 121 - 9, XP008033490 [X] 1 * compound 10e * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00397919308020410 | [ ] - Ambinter Screening Library, PARIS, FRANCE, AMBINTER, (20040101), XP002290755 | [PX] - Enamine Screening Library, KIEV, 01103, UKRAINE, ENAMINE, (20040630), XP002290756 [PX] 1 |