Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] |
23.09.2005 | Change - inventor | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] |
08.07.2005 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] |
20.05.2005 | Definitive list of designations | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] |
13.05.2005 | Change - applicant | published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] |
12.05.2005 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
12.05.2005 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
15.12.2004 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
01.10.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] |
27.08.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] |