EP1467307 - Optical information reading apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Denso Wave Incorporated 4-2-12, Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-0001 / JP | For all designated states DENSO ELECS CO., LTD. 1, Shinmichi, Takatana-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken 446-8507 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states Denso Wave Incorporated 4-2-12, Toranomon, Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-0001 / JP | ||
For all designated states DENSO ELECS CO., LTD. 1, Shinmichi, Takatana-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken 446-8507 / JP | |||
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Denso Wave Incorporated 4-2-12, Toranomon, Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-0001 / JP | ||
For all designated states DENSO ELECS CO., LTD. 1, Shinmichi, Takatana-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken 446-8507 / JP | |||
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states Denso Wave Incorporated 4-2-12, Toranomon, Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-0001 / JP | ||
For all designated states DENSO ELECS CO., LTD. 50 Kojiritsuki, Hitosugi-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-0003 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toyama, Hiroshi c/o DENSO WAVE INC. 4-2-12, Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | 02 /
Ooshima, Tadao c/o DENSO WAVE INC. 4-2-12, Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | 03 /
Ito, Makoto c/o DENSO ELECS CO., LTD, Anjo-Shi Aichi-ken 446-8507 / JP | [2005/45] |
Former [2004/42] | 01 /
Toyama, Hiroshi c/o DENSO WAVE INC. 4-2-12, Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | ||
02 /
Ooshima, Tadao c/o DENSO WAVE INC. 4-2-12, Toranomon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | |||
03 /
Ito, Makoto, c/o DENSO ELECS CO., LTD 50, Kojiritsuki, Hitosugi-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken 448-0003 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 04004732.6 | 01.03.2004 | [2004/42] | Priority number, date | JP20030055750 | 03.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003055750 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1467307 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1467307 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10, G02B3/00 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
G06K7/10732 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/27] |
Former [2004/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optische Informationslesevorrichtung | [2004/42] | English: | Optical information reading apparatus | [2004/42] | French: | Dispositif de lecture d'informations optique | [2004/42] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 27.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2002055060 ; | JP2000241755 [ ]; | [A]US5280161 (NIWA KATSUHISA [JP]) [A] 1,2,7 * abstract *; | [A]JP2000241755 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1,3 * figure 14 *; | [A]US6212012 (TANAKA KOICHIRO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 36; figures 1A-1C *; | US2002021496 [ ] (AKIYAMA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0012] - [0015] *; | [A]US2003038179 (TSIKOS CONTANTINE J [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0047] , [0887] , [0977] , [1822]; figures 1q1,1i3a,1i3b,1g3 * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020604), vol. 2002, no. 06, & JP2002055060 A 20020220 (SAKI CORP:KK) [AD] 1,3 * abstract * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 12, & JP2000241755 A 20000908 (FUJITSU LTD) [ ] * abstract * |