|
04.03.2011 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.02.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.11.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.11.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
16.11.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.11.2009 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2009 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.07.2009 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2009 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.06.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.02.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.08.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.10.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
28.10.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.10.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2005 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Supplemental sheet B (lack of unity of invention) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Supplemental sheet D (claims incurring fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Supplemental sheet B (lack of unity of invention) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2004 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2004 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
67 |
|
02.03.2004 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
02.03.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
02.03.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
02.03.2004 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |