EP1462955 - Providing information links via a network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/17] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | ||
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Evans, Shane C. 28409 Ne 138th Place Duvall WA 98019 / US | 02 /
Toll, Roderick M. 23115 NE 18 th Street Sammamish WA 98074 / US | 03 /
Fowles, Ken Delmar P.O. Box 731 211 West Nevada Avenue Roslyn WA 98941 / US | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04004873.8 | 02.03.2004 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | US20030401620 | 27.03.2003 Original published format: US 401620 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1462955 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1462955 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1462955 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, H04L29/08, G06F9/44 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
H04L69/329 (EP,KR,US);
G06F16/9558 (KR);
H04L63/08 (KR);
H04L67/34 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/40] | Title | German: | Bereitstellung von Verweisen auf Informationen über ein Netzwerk | [2009/52] | English: | Providing information links via a network | [2004/40] | French: | Fourniture de liaisons d'informations par un réseau | [2004/40] |
Former [2004/40] | Bereitstellung von den Verweisen auf die Informationen über ein Netzwerk | Examination procedure | 16.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 13.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.12.2009 | 24.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.04.2010 | BE | 28.04.2010 | CY | 28.04.2010 | CZ | 28.04.2010 | DK | 28.04.2010 | EE | 28.04.2010 | FI | 28.04.2010 | HU | 28.04.2010 | NL | 28.04.2010 | PL | 28.04.2010 | RO | 28.04.2010 | SE | 28.04.2010 | SI | 28.04.2010 | SK | 28.04.2010 | TR | 28.04.2010 | BG | 28.07.2010 | GR | 29.07.2010 | ES | 08.08.2010 | PT | 30.08.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
TR | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 28.04.2010 | |
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 28.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0118636 (AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL RELATE [US]) [Y] 8-10,20-22,25 * abstract * * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 3 ** page 7, line 33 - page 8, line 30 *; | [XY]US2002054138 (HENNUM ERIK [US]) [X] 1-7,11-13,16-18,42,45,46,49-51 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 7 - paragraph 11 * * page 2, paragraph 14 - page 3, paragraph 23 * * page 4, paragraph 52 - paragraph 54 * [Y] 8-10,20-22,25 |