EP1458010 - Emission device comprising an ultra-high pressure mercury discharge lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states USHIODENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2015/19] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states USHIODENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tukamoto, Takuya 4-227, Kaminoda Shikama-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Yoshikazu 1-39-2-506, Fujigaoka Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Arimoto, Tomoyoshi 196-31, Kamiokacho Nishitori Tatuno-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2015/19] |
Former [2004/38] | 01 /
Tukamoto, Takuya 4-227, Kaminoda Shikama-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Suzuki, Yoshikazu 1-39-2-506, Fujigaoka Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Arimoto, Tomoyoshi 196-31, Kamiokacho Nishitori Tatuno-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Tomerius, Isabel, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | Tomerius, Isabel, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwälte Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/43] | Tomerius, Isabel, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwälte Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/38] | Tomerius, Isabel, Dr., et al Lang & Tomerius, Bavariaring 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04005013.0 | 03.03.2004 | [2004/38] | Priority number, date | JP20030067477 | 13.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003067477 | JP20030417420 | 16.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003417420 | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1458010 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1458010 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1458010 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/82, H01J61/073, H01J61/20, H05B41/231, // H01J61/86, H05B41/292 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
H05B41/2928 (EP,US);
H01J61/0732 (EP,US);
H01J61/822 (EP,US);
H01J61/86 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/38] | H01J61/82, H01J61/073, H01J61/20, H05B41/231 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2015/19] |
Former [2008/36] | DE, NL | ||
Former [2004/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Emissionsvorrichtung mit einer Superhochdruck-Quecksilberentladungslampe | [2004/38] | English: | Emission device comprising an ultra-high pressure mercury discharge lamp | [2004/38] | French: | Dispositif émetteur comprenant une lampe à décharge de mercure à ultra-haute pression | [2004/38] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 27.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2817002 (DYKE WALTER P, et al); | [AD]US5109181 (FISCHER HANNS E [DE], et al) [AD] 1 * claims 1,2 *; | [AD]US5497049 (FISCHER HANNS E [DE]) [AD] 1 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP1150336 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1-5,19,20 *; | [X]US2002117968 (DERRA GUENTHER HANS [DE], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0057]; claims 1-13 *; | [AD]US6545430 (ONO SHUNSUKE [JP], et al); | [PA]EP1309228 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1 * claims 6-15 *; | [E]EP1418795 (USHIO ELECTRIC INC [JP]) [E] 1 * page 14, lines 13-30; claims 1,2 * | Examination | EP1176855 |